hide
Named Entity Searches
hide
Matching Documents
The documents where this entity occurs most often are shown below. Click on a document to open it.
Browsing named entities in Isaac O. Best, History of the 121st New York State Infantry. You can also browse the collection for March 25th or search for March 25th in all documents.
Your search returned 7 results in 5 document sections:
Isaac O. Best, History of the 121st New York State Infantry, Chapter 18 : back to Petersburg and winter quarters (search)
Isaac O. Best, History of the 121st New York State Infantry, Chapter 19 : the capture of Petersburg by 6th Corps (search)
Isaac O. Best, History of the 121st New York State Infantry, Appendix (search)
Company C
Captains: C. A. Moon, August 23, 1862 to January 17, 1863; C. J. Campbell, April 22, 1863 to March 20, 1864; J. W. Johnston, November 18, 1864 to June 25, 1865.
First Lieutenants: T. S. Arnold, August 23 to August 30, 1862; A. Cameron, August 31 to November 9, 1862; F. Gorton, November 10, 1862 to January 28, 1863; C. M. Bradt, February 20 to April 9, 1863; H. Upton, May 3, 1863 to February 27, 1864; J. A. Heath, July 25, 1863 to December 12, 1864; F. W. Morse, December 23, 1864 to March 23, 1865; J. T. Morton, March 25 to April 6, 1865; Eli Oaks, April 30 to July 24, 1865.
Second Lieutenants: A. Cameron, August 23 to August 31, 1862; C. M. Bradt, August 30, 1862 to February 20, 1863; S. Miller, February 20 to May 13, 1863; H. Upton, April 15 to March 3, 1863; G. W. Quackenbush, May 29 to July 9, 1864; J. W. Johnston, July 9 to November 18, 1864; J. H. Smith, April 29 to June 25, 1865.
Company D
Captains: J. D. Fish, August 23, 1862 to May 12, 1864; D. D. Jackson, May 23, 1864 to May 17, 1865.
First Lieutenants: D. M. Kenyon, August 16, 1862 to March 22, 1864; A. C. Rice, April 10 to September 20, 1863; D. D. Jackson, February 27 to June 23, 1864; F. E. Lowe, May 23 to December 31, 1864; L. C. Bartlett, June 22, 1863 to June 25, 1865.
Second Lieutenants: Chas. E. Staring, August 23, 1862 to June 14, 1863; G. R. Wheeler, March 25 to May 15, 1863; J. W. Johnston, May 14 to September 30, 1863; D. D. Jackson, September 20, 1863 to February 27, 1864; N. Post, April 16 to June 25, 1865.