Browsing named entities in Lucius R. Paige, History of Cambridge, Massachusetts, 1630-1877, with a genealogical register. You can also browse the
collection for June 3rd, 1859 AD or search for June 3rd, 1859 AD in
all documents.
Your search returned 1 result in 1 document
section:
neral Court six years, between 1841 and 1854.
On the incorporation of the City in 1846, he was elected as its first Mayor, and was reelected to the same office in 1847, 1853, 1860, and 1861.
He was succeeded in the ministry by Rev. Henry Lambert, June 3, 1841, who resigned April 19, 1846. Rev. George G. Ingersoll, H. C. 1815, D. D. 1845, was installed Dec. 3, 1847, and resigned Oct. 14, 1849.
He died in 1863. Rev. Frederick W. Holland, H. C. 1831, was installed Oct., 1851, and resigned June 3, 1859; he is actively engaged elsewhere in the work of the ministry.
His successors, for short terms, were Rev. Frederick N. Knapp, H. C. 1843, from July, 1860, to July, 1861; Rev. William T. Clarke, from Oct. 1861 to Oct. 1862; Rev. Henry C. Badger, from Nov., 1862, to Nov., 1863; Rev. Rufus P. Stebbins, Amh. C. 1834, D. D. 1851, was a stated supply from Jan., 1864, to May, 1864. Rev. Stephen G. Bulfinch, Columbian, Wash.
1827, D. D. 1864, was pastor from Sept., 1865, to July, 1869, and died