C., May 27, 1863.
Jas. B. West, Promotion, Feb. 28, 1863; Resigned, June 14, 1865.
N. G. Parker, Promotion, May 5, 1863; Captain, Feb., 1865.
W. H. Hyde, Promotion, May 5, 1863; Resigned, April 3, 1865.
Henry A. Stone, 8th Me., JuneMay 5, 1863; Resigned, April 3, 1865.
Henry A. Stone, 8th Me., June 26, 1863; Resigned, Dec. 16, 1864.
J. A. Trowbridge, Promotion, Aug. 11, 1863; Resigned, Nov. 29, 1864.
A. W. Jackson, Promotion, Aug. 26, 1863; Captain, April 30, 1864.
Chas. E. Parker, Promotion, Aug. 26, 1863; Resigned, Nov. 29, 1864.
R. A1. Gaston, 100th Pa., Oct. 13, 1862; First Lt., April 15, 1863.
W. H. Hyde, 6th Ct., Oct. 13, 1862; First Lt., May 5, 1863.
JAs. B. West, 100th Pa., Oct. 13, 1862; First Lt., Feb. 28, 1863.
Harry C. West, 100th Pa., Oct. 13, 1862; ResiN. Y. Vol. Eng., Feb. 17, 1863; First Lt., April 16, 1863.
N. G. Parker, 1st Mass. Cavalry, March, 1863; First Lt., May 5, 1863.
A. H. Tirrell, 1st Mass. Cav., March 6, 1863; Resigned, July 22, 1863.
A. W. Jackson, 8th Me., March 6, 1863; F