Browsing named entities in Lucius R. Paige, History of Cambridge, Massachusetts, 1630-1877, with a genealogical register. You can also browse the
collection for October 1st, 1868 AD or search for October 1st, 1868 AD in
all documents.
Your search returned 1 result in 1 document
section:
1861, was pastor from the first of December, 1863, until April, 1866.
He was afterwards settled in Maiden, and about 1872 took orders in the Episcopal Church. Rev. Henry I. Cushman was ordained May 15, 1867, resigned May 31, 1868, and was afterwards associate pastor of the Second Universalist Church in Boston, and pastor of the First Universalist Church in Providence.
His successor was Rev. Frank Maguire, a graduate of St. Lawrence Theological School, 1863, whose pastorate extended from Oct. 1, 1868, to Jan. 1, 1871, after which he was settled at Fitchburg.
He was ordained in 1863, and had previously preached at Greenport, N. Y., and Waterville, Me. Rev. Sumner Ellis, ordained at Boston, Nov. 1851, and successively pastor at Boston, Salem, Brighton, Lynn, Milwaukee, Chicago, and Newark, had charge of this parish, as stated supply, from April 1, 1872, to Sept. 29, 1874, when he returned to Chicago.
He was succeeded, as stated supply, by Rev. Henry I. Cushman, Nov. 1, 1874, and by Re