oxbury, were designated for that purpose.
Marshall's Washington, vol.
II. p. 230. —Memorandum made by Dr. Benjamin Cutter many years since (died 1864).
1871-72. The Arlington Water Works were constructed.
Water Commissioners were elected in 1873.
Cost of construction to the town, over $300,000. The source of supply is an artificial reservoir located near by in Lexington, which receives the waters of 173 acres, embracing the area known as the Great Meadows in that town.
1872
The tod ceiling was thrown down and badly cracked.
Throughout the town many chimneys were blown down and some beautiful trees uprooted or broken down.
The loss in the town amounted to $25,000 to $30,000.—Statement from First Parish Records.
In 1872-73 the town erected the large brick Russell School House, at a cost of $57,911.04 and $713 for additional land, to replace the former school-house which had been burned in 1872.
In 1872 the Arlington Land Company is mentioned in the town records.
Charles H. Crane, 1867.
J. Winslow Peirce, 1868-71, 1873.
Jacob F. Hobbs, 1868-70, 1872.
Otis Green, 1868, 1872.
James Durgin, 1872, 1874-78.
Henry Mott, 1873, 1878, 1879.
Henry Swan, 1873.
John Schouler, 1873.
John Schouler, 1874-77.
William G. Peck, 1874-77.
William H. Allen, 1878, 1879.
James A. Bailey, 1879.
Assessors.
l, 1869-71.
Ira O. Carter, 1872.
Henry Mott, 1872, 1873-79.
B. Delmont Locke, 1873-79.
Charles Schwamb, 1873-79.
Charles Schwamb, 1873.
Thomas. P. Peirce, 1873-79.
Town Clerks.
Abel R. Proctor, 1867, 1868 (resigned).
John F. A1873.
Thomas. P. Peirce, 1873-79.
Town Clerks.
Abel R. Proctor, 1867, 1868 (resigned).
John F. Allen, 1868-74 (resigned).
B. Delmont Locke, 1874-79.
Town Treasurers.
Abel R. Proctor, 1867.
John F.1873-79.
Town Clerks.
Abel R. Proctor, 1867, 1868 (resigned).
John F. Allen, 1868-74 (resigned).
B. Delmont Locke, 1874-79.
Town Treasurers.
Abel R. Proctor, 1867.
John F. Allen, 1868-74 (resigned).
B. Delmont Locke, 1874-79.
School Committee.
Josiah Crosby, Henry Swan and rs, in 1869, but declined.-70.
Ira O. Carter, 1870-73.
Moses Hunt, 1870-71.
Charles E. Goodwin, 1870-79am H. Ryder, 1872 (resigned).
Rev. J. M. Finotti, 1873-76 (left town).
Rev. Amos Harris, 1874-76 (left t
a, m. Isaac Shattuck, 24 Jan. 1839; Rebecca Crosby, d. 7. Sept. 1822, a. 2.
63. Samuel, s. of Samuel (42), m. Nabby or Abigail Cutter, 21 Jan. 1787, dau. of Samuel Cutter (par.
13). She d. 17 Oct. 1803, a. 35. Four children; Oliver, d. here in 1873, being one of them.
A child of Samuel, 4th, d. 10 Sept. 1789, a. 16 ds. See Wyman, 269.
64. Joseph, s. of Samuel (42), m. Nancy Ireland.
Had Nancy —dau.
of Joseph and Nancy—d. 25 Sept. 1799, a. 17 mos. (g. s.); and others.
He resided in Chaious mechanic, and an upright, excellent, enterprising citizen.
In 1832 he sold to James Schouler, of Lynn, Mass., a calico printer, his place in West Cambridge, with the dwelling-house, factory, mill privilege, &c. They were destroyed by fire in 1873 or ‘74.—J. B. R.
8. Harriet, m. John Augustus, of Lexington, 6 Nov. 1817. Leonard, m. Hannah Wilson, of W. Camb., 16 Apr. 1820.
Han-Nah, W. of Leonard, d. 27 Mar. 1840, a. 43.
Joseph, of Billerica, m. Elizabeth Prentiss, of W. Camb., 11 Ma