Browsing named entities in Lucius R. Paige, History of Cambridge, Massachusetts, 1630-1877, with a genealogical register. You can also browse the
collection for Henry C. Badger or search for Henry C. Badger in
all documents.
Your search returned 2 results in 1 document
section:
3, and installed here Jan. 1, 1834.
He resigned May 4, 1846, and was succeeded by Rev. John F. W. Ware, H. C. 1838, who was installed Nov. 29, 1846, and resigned April 1, 1864.
He is now pastor of the church in Arlington Street, Boston.
Rev. Henry C. Badger was installed Jan. 15, 1865, resigned Oct. 1, 1865, and was succeeded by Rev. George W. Briggs, B. U. 1825, D. D. 1855, who was installed April 3, 1867.
The four successors of Mr. Gannett are still actively engaged in the ministry; may ied June 3, 1859; he is actively engaged elsewhere in the work of the ministry.
His successors, for short terms, were Rev. Frederick N. Knapp, H. C. 1843, from July, 1860, to July, 1861; Rev. William T. Clarke, from Oct. 1861 to Oct. 1862; Rev. Henry C. Badger, from Nov., 1862, to Nov., 1863; Rev. Rufus P. Stebbins, Amh. C. 1834, D. D. 1851, was a stated supply from Jan., 1864, to May, 1864. Rev. Stephen G. Bulfinch, Columbian, Wash.
1827, D. D. 1864, was pastor from Sept., 1865, to July, 1869,