. William S. Karr, A. C. 1851, was installed Jan. 15, 1873, and dismissed Nov. 22, 1875, to take a professorship in the Hartford Theological Seminary. Rev. James S. Hoyt, Y. C. 1851, D. D. Olivet College, 1876, commenced his pastorate Sept. 3, 1876, and was installed on the 15th day of the same month.
Deacons.
Elected. Held office until Age.
William FiskJan. 3, 1833DiedApril 18, 186480
Samuel BarrettJan. 3, 1833ResignedOct. 2, 1846.
William AdamsJuly 3, 1846ResignedMay 5, 1853
Thaddeus B. BigelowFeb. 28, 1851ResignedDec. 19, 1856
William DavisSept. 29, 1854Removed to N. H.
Caleb H. WarnerSept. 29, 1854ResignedSept. 29, 1872
Sumner AlbeeMarch 5, 1858
Lucas B. GroverApril 24, 1868
Henry N. TiltonApril 24, 1868
second Evangelical Congregational.—The Second Evangelical Church was organized March 30, 1842, and erected a commodious meeting-house on the easterly corner of Austin and Temple streets, which was dedicated Jan. 3, 1844.
Meetings had previously been held in a cha
rd F.
Ames, Simon.
Appleton, John.
Ayres, James.
Alexander, Henry.
Bangs, Isaiah.
Bardwell, Seth.
Barker, John.
Barker, Mark.
Barton, Charles.
Bates, Jacob H.
Bates, William.
Beers, Joseph.
Bent, Newell.
Bigelow, Benjamin.
Bigelow, Thaddeus B.
Biglow, Abraham.
Boardman, Andrew.
Boardman, John.
Boardman, William.
Bos worth, Isaac.
Bowman, Benjamin.
Brackett, John.
Brackett, Joseph.
Bradford, Gamaliel L.
Bray man, Daniel PBigelow, Thaddeus B.
Biglow, Abraham.
Boardman, Andrew.
Boardman, John.
Boardman, William.
Bos worth, Isaac.
Bowman, Benjamin.
Brackett, John.
Brackett, Joseph.
Bradford, Gamaliel L.
Bray man, Daniel P.
Brigham, Lincoln.
Brigham, Taylor.
Brooks, Cyrus.
Brown, Edward.
Brown, William.
Bruce, Abel W.
Bruce, Chandler.
Bruce, Sylvanus.
Bryant, Amos.
Burridge, Joseph.
Burrows, James.
Butler, Aaron.
Brooks, Calvin.
Bogle, William.
Barnard, Alpha.
Barnard, Silas.
Baker, George.
Baxter, Valentine.
Cambridge, Frederick.
Carpenter, Benjamin.
Chamberlin, Ephraim.
Chamberlin, John.
Chaplin, James P.
Cheney, Artemas.
Child, James.
aiah Bangs, 1852, 1853.
John Livermore, 1852, 1853, 1867, 1868.
William A. Brewer, 1853.
Joseph Whitney, 1853, 1854.
Franklin Hall, 1854, 1856.
Thaddeus B. Bigelow, 1854.
Justin A. Jacobs, 1854.
Stephen Smith, 1855.
J. M. S. Williams, 1855.
Oliver T. Leighton, 1855.
David S. Buck, 1855.
George Fisher, 1855.
,
Elected Oct. 6, 1851, in place of Edmund A. Chapman, deceased. 1851-1853.
John Hews, 1851.
Anson Hooker, 1851, 1852.
Richard C. Joseph, 1851.
Thaddeus B. Bigelow, 1852.
Ambrose Chamberlain, 1852, 1853.
John W. Donallan, 1853.
George W. Livermore, 1853, 1854.
George Meacham, 1853.
John Taylor, 1853.
Henry 53, 1854.
George G. Ryder, 1853, 1854, 1863, 1864, 1867.
Charles H. Saunders, 1853, 1854.
Oliver Tenney, 1853, 1854.
William Watriss, 1853, 1854.
Thaddeus B. Bigelow, 1854.
O. H. P. Green, 1854.
Rufus Lamson, 1854, 1855.
William A. Munroe, 1854.
Benjamin F. Nourse, 1854, 1856, 1857.
Henry Noyes, 1854, 1855.
Ebe
99, 416, 28.
Bartlett, 81, 231.
Batchelder, 14, 168, 233, 310.
Baxter, 266, 327, 53.
Beach, 81.
Beale, 32. 54, 9, 69, 224, 56, 70, 9.
Bean, 225.
Beebe, 321.
Beecher, 325.
Beiler, 339.
Belcher, 59, 75, 124, 35, 224, 86, 7, 363, 94, 403.
Belknap, 133.
Bell, 327.
Bellingham, 27, 43.
Benjamin, 11, 20, 1, 32, 239, 459.
Bennett, 35, 327.
Bernard, 143, 405, 6.
Besbeech, 35.
Besse, 347.
Bethune, 310.
Betts, 35, 59, 260.
Bidwell, 331.
Bigelow, 187, 326.
Biglow, 208, 310.
Binney, 320.
Bird, 310, 36.
Bishop, 346-52.
Blake, 177, 321.
Blanchard, 426.
Bland, 332.
Blaney, 426.
Blathwait, 77.
Bliss, 328, 438.
Blodgett, 35, 58, 317.
Blood, 62.
Blowers, 35, 135, 288.
Blumfield, 35.
Bond, 4, 226, 310, 403. 18, 19.
Bonner, 350.
Bontecou, 321.
Boone, 76.
Boradell, 258.
Bordman, 44, 5, 59, 75, 124, 5, 32, 3, 42, 75, 6, 9, 82, 4, 212-14, 27, 31, 3, 84, 92, 7, 374.
Borland, 168-70,