attalion, Mass. Heavy Artillery, Feb. 20, 1862.
Discharged for promotion, and commissioned First Lieutenant, N. C. Volunteers, afterwards 35th U. S. Colored Infantry, May 5, 1863.
Quartermaster, May 18, 1863.
Captain. Discharged (disability), June 28, 1864.
Drew, Josiah R.
Second Lieutenant, 23d Mass. Infantry, May 6, 1862. First Lieutenant, Dec. 29, 1862.
Resigned, Dec. 13, 1863. First Lieutenant, 18th U. S. Colored Infantry, Mar. 30, 1865.
Mustered out, Feb. 21, 1866.
Edgerly, Charles E. B.
Sergeant, 12th Mass. Infantry, June 26, 1861.
Discharged (disability), Nov. 11, 1862. Second Lieutenant, 84th U. S. Colored Infantry.
Discharged, July 28, 1864.
Emerson, William.
Private, 1st Mass. Infantry, May 23, 1861.
Discharged (disability), Oct. 31, 1862.
Captain, 1st N. C. Colored Troops, afterwards 35th U. S. Colored Infantry, May 18, 1863.
Discharged, May 18, 1866.
Emery, Edward C. T.
Private, 30th Mass. Infantry, Nov. 9, 1861.
Transferred, Mar. 28, 1863
n, Alonzo, 414, 465
Eaton, C. G., 178, 414, 465, 522
Eaton, Edward, 581
Eaton, H. B., 48
Eaton, J. G., 160
Eaton, J. H., 179, 414, 522
Eaton, J. M., 274
Eaton, J. S., 573
Eaton, John, 274
Eaton, L. O., 274, 523
Eaton, S. K., 274
Eaton, W. B., 48
Eaton, W. S., 581
Eayers, C. G. A., 48
Eayers, C. G. A., 380
Eddy, Augustus, 414
Eddy, D. B., 48
Eddy, D. F., 274
Eddy, G. S., 48
Eddy, G. W., 523, 414
Eddy, J. F., 274
Eddy, S. S., 274
Edes, R. T., 48
Edgell, J. D., 274
Edgerly, C. E. B., 488
Edgerly, Samuel, 48
Edgerton, O. P., 274
Edgett, I. H., 274
Edlisson, Henry, 465
Edmands, B. B., 274
Edmands, G. D., 581
Edmands, J. C., 179, 212, 414, 523, 607, 645
Edmands, T. F., 212, 523
Edson, C. F., 274
Edson, Daniel, Jr., 274
Edson, E., 573
Edson, J. H., 212
Edson, Theodore, 414, 523
Edwards, C. L., 274
Edwards, E. A., 274
Edwards, G. W., 274
Edwards, H. D., 48
Edwards, Oliver, 179, 212, 414, 523
Edwards, S. D., 48
Edwards, S. F., 274
Edwards, S. P.,