First Lieutenant, 2d Iowa Infantry, May 28, 1861. Regimental Quartermaster, Aug. 7, 1861.
Captain, Commissary of Subsistence, U. S. Volunteers, June 30, 1864.
See U. S. Army.
Eaton, Charles G.
See General Officers.
Edlisson, Henry.
Residence in Massachusetts at time of enlistment.
Second Lieutenant, 70th N. Y. Infantry; commissioned, Jan. 16, 1862, to rank, June 21, 1861. First Lieutenant, commissioned, Dec. 1, 1862, to rank, May 6, 1862.
Discharged, Dec. 19, 1862.
Eldredge, Daniel.
Born at Chatham, Mass., July 7, 1841.
Private and Sergeant, 3d N. H. Infantry, Aug. 2, 1861, to Jan., 1864. Second Lieutenant, Jan., 1864. First Lieutenant, July 7, 1864.
Captain, Jan. 4, 1865.
Declined appointment.
Discharged, May 21, 1865, to accept appointment in 3d Veteran Reserve Corps. Second Lieutenant, 3d Veteran Reserve Corps, to date, May 15, 1865.
Discharged, June 30, 1866.
Eldridge, Hamilton N.
See General Officers.
Elliott, Richard A.
Second Lieutenant,
581
Edmands, J. C., 179, 212, 414, 523, 607, 645
Edmands, T. F., 212, 523
Edson, C. F., 274
Edson, Daniel, Jr., 274
Edson, E., 573
Edson, J. H., 212
Edson, Theodore, 414, 523
Edwards, C. L., 274
Edwards, E. A., 274
Edwards, G. W., 274
Edwards, H. D., 48
Edwards, Oliver, 179, 212, 414, 523
Edwards, S. D., 48
Edwards, S. F., 274
Edwards, S. P., 48
Egan, C. L., 393
Egleston, Melville, 274
Eigenbrodt, C. S., 274
Elder, J. L., 274
Elder, R. B., 48
Eldredge, A. S., 48
Eldredge, Daniel, 466
Eldredge, Edward, 48
Eldredge, H. C., 48
Eldredge, J. H., 48
Eldredge, John, 48
Eldredge, R. D., 48
Eldredge, Samuel, 48
Eldridge, Elisha, Jr., 274
Eldridge, H. N., 179, 414, 466, 523
Eldridge, S. N., 275
Eldridge, S. W., 414
Eliot, T. D., 645
Eliot, W. G., 592, 600
Eliott, W. P., 581
Ellenwood, E. H., 275
Ellington, Raymond, 275
Ellingwood, L. H., 275
Elliot, G. H., 414, 523
Elliott, A. D., 275
Elliott, E. B., 645
Elliott, G. H., 275
Elliott, R. A., 275, 466