Second Lieutenant, 43d Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 12, 1862.
Mustered out, July 30, 1863. Second Lieutenant, 58th Mass. Infantry, Feb. 15, 1864.
Captain, Apr. 15, 1864.
Discharged (disability), Oct. 31, 1864.
O'Brien, Edward F.
First Lieutenant, 28th Mass. Infantry, Oct. 30, 1863.
Discharged (disability), Oct. 13, 1864.
O'Brien, John S.
Second Lieutenant, 48th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Jan. 15, 1863.
Resigned, Mar. 7, 1863.
O'Brien, Martin.
Second Lieutenant, 9th Mass. Infantry, Sept. 26, 1862. First Lieutenant, Oct. 20, 1862.
Captain, July 29, 1863.
Mustered out, June 21, 1864.
O'Brien, William J.
First Lieutenant, 24th Mass. Infantry, Oct. 14, 1864.
Captain, Oct. 15, 1864.
Mustered out, Jan. 20, 1866.
O'Conner, James.
Second Lieutenant, 37th Mass. Infantry, May 24, 1864. First Lieutenant, Feb. 1, 1865.
Transferred to 20th Mass. Infantry.
Mustered out, July 15, 1865.
Odell, George D.
First Lieu
W. G., 108
Nye, O. H., 327
Nye, E. B., 327
Nye, F. K. S., 108
Nye, J. A., 493
Nye, W. C., 108
Nye, W. H., 327
Nyman, F. W., 108
O.
Oakes, Benjamin F., 493
Oakes, B. Frank, 327
Oakes, T. F., 386
Oakey, Daniel, 2d Mass. Inf, 327, 606
Oakey, Daniel, 693
Oakman, H. A., 327, 493, 546
Oakman, N. S., 327
Oates, J. H., 108
Oatley, John C., 108
O'Brien, E. F., 327
O'Brien, J. E., 693
O'Brien, J. S., Navy, 108
O'Brien, J. S., 48th Mass. Inf., 327
O'Brien, James, 223
O'Brien, Martin, 327
O'Brien, Oliver, 108
O'Brien, W. J., 327
O'Callaghan, E. J., 108
Occleston, W. B., 435, 546
O'Connell, P. A., 386, 435, 546
O'Connell, P. H., 693
O'Connor, F. A., 108
O'Connor, James, 327
O'Connor, Peter, 108
Odell, G. D., 327
Odiorne, D. W., 475
Odiorne, Frederic, 327
Odiorne, L. L., 108
Odiorne, W. C., 108
O'Donnell, James, 327
O'Dowd, Francis, 327
Ogden, F. G., 327
O'Gorman, J. J., 327
O'Hara, H. W., 110
O'Hara, M. F., 327
O'Hare, Thomas, 327, 435, 546
O'Ke