Browsing named entities in Lucius R. Paige, History of Cambridge, Massachusetts, 1630-1877, with a genealogical register. You can also browse the
collection for Radnor (United Kingdom) or search for Radnor (United Kingdom) in
all documents.
Your search returned 1 result in 1 document
section:
, 1865, and resigned Nov. 20, 1867.
He was succeeded, Dec. 4, 1868, by Rev. George H. Miner, B. U. 1863, who resigned Aug. 21, 1872. Rev. Hugh C. Townley, who graduated at the University of Rochester, 1858, was called to office here April 1, 1873, having previously been settled at Peekskill, N. Y., and Woburn, Mass. He resigned April 1, 1875.
The present pastor is Rev. George W. Holman, who was born in Somerville, 1841, educated and ordained in the State of New York, and had been pastor at Radnor, Pa., Fort Edward, N. Y., Lewiston, Me., and Holliston, Mass. He was installed Nov. 7, 1875.
Deacons.
Elected. Held office until Age.
Enos ReedOct. 17, 1827DiedJuly 8, 187175
John DonallanApril 1, 1829DiedMay 13, 186769
Henry S. HillsSept. 15, 1854
Daniel GrantOct. 4, 1870ResignedOct. 30, 1874
William B. SavageOct. 4, 1870
Alonzo StewartJuly 2, 1875
Ambrose H. SanbornJuly 2, 1875
First Evangelical Congregational.—The First Evangelical Congregational Church, formed in that part