hing here in the previous summer, became the regular pastor April 30, 1858, resigned April 1, 1865, was installed over the First Baptist Church in Worcester, and on the 5th of January, 1873, took charge of the First Baptist Church in Cambridge.
Rev. Frank R. Morse, D. C. 1861, a graduate of Newton Theological Institution, commenced his pastorate Sept. 3, 1865, and resigned Nov. 20, 1867.
He was succeeded, Dec. 4, 1868, by Rev. George H. Miner, B. U. 1863, who resigned Aug. 21, 1872. Rev. Hugh C. Townley, who graduated at the University of Rochester, 1858, was called to office here April 1, 1873, having previously been settled at Peekskill, N. Y., and Woburn, Mass. He resigned April 1, 1875.
The present pastor is Rev. George W. Holman, who was born in Somerville, 1841, educated and ordained in the State of New York, and had been pastor at Radnor, Pa., Fort Edward, N. Y., Lewiston, Me., and Holliston, Mass. He was installed Nov. 7, 1875.
Deacons.
Elected. Held office until Age.
E
iler, 403.
Talcott, 11, 12, 21, 32, 9, 175, 233, 54.
Tanner, 440.
Taylor, 58, 75, 272, 3, 328, 30, 8.
Temple, 307, 10.
Thacher, 132.
Thatcher, 55, 133, 43, 70, 85, 292, 375, 407-9, 21, 8.
Thayer, 177, 331.
Thompson, 226.
Thoms, 342.
Thorndike, 186.
Thornton, 370.
Thurloe, 64.
Thurston, 334.
Tidd, 121.
Tilton, 78, 326.
Timlow, 327.
Tirrell, 320,
Tomlins, 33.
Torrey, 351.
Touteville, 258.
Towne, 36, 41, 59, 75, 255, 7, 364, 73.
Townley, 324.
Townsend, 126, 208, 403.
Tracy, 170.
Trafton, 330.
Train, 208.
Tray, 391.
Trevett, 419.
Trowbridge, 81, 92, 133, 5, 214, 92, 375.
Truesdale, 81.
Trulan, 433.
Trumbull, 31, 440.
Tufts, 292, 315.
Tupper, 321.
Turell, 294.
Turner, 287.
Twining, 325.
Tyler, 200.
Tyng, 77, 257, 339.
Underhill, 396.
Uphan, 116.
Usher, 95, 108, 273.
Vail, 309.
Valentine, 201.
Vane, 24, 52.
Vassall, 130-4, 168-70, 292, 307, 8, 75, 407, 17