Browsing named entities in Rev. James K. Ewer , Company 3, Third Mass. Cav., Roster of the Third Massachusetts Cavalry Regiment in the war for the Union. You can also browse the
collection for Robert F. Yeaton or search for Robert F. Yeaton in
all documents.
Your search returned 1 result in 1 document
section:
O. Sept. 28, 1865 as Com. Sergt.
Marcus M. Sullivan, En. Boston, 23, clerk.
Private Dec. 31, 1864; Sergt. Feb. 10, 1865; 1st Lieut. Oct. 5, 1865.
M. M.. Sept. 28, 1865 as Com. Sergt.
Samuel W. Lewis, Danvers, 25, s: ship carpenter.
Private Oct. 7, 1861; Corp. May 20, 1862; 1st Sergt. Jan. 1, 1863; 2nd Lieut. Oct. 27, 1863.
M. O. Nov. 26, 1864.
Edward J. Noyes, Lowell. 2nd Lieut. Nov. 12, 1862.
Disch. and Ap. Capt. 1st Texas Cav. Nov. 1862.
Disch. as Maj. Aug. 17, 1864.
Robert F. Yeaton, Lowell. 2nd Lieut. May 9, 1862.
Resigned Feb. 13, 1863.
Jared P. Maxfield, Lowell, 21, s; clerk.
Private Nov. 22, 1861: 2nd Lieut. Feb. 14, 1863.
Disch. disa. Aug. 28, 1863.
John H, Weston, Boston, 31, m; caulker.
2nd Lieut. Sept. 15, 1862.
Resigned July 18, 1863.
Lawrence Conlin, Boston, 38, s; carpenter.
2nd Lieut. Dec. 9, 1862.
Resigned Jan. 15, 1864.
John M. Rolston, Charlestown, 22, m; painter.
Sergt. Maj. Aug. 21, 1862; 2nd Lieut. Feb. 21, 1863.
Disch. disa.