6, 1865.
Howard, George H.
Second Lieutenant, 16th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 1, 1861. First Lieutenant, Nov. 10, 1861.
Resigned, Aug. 10, 1862.
Howard, George W.
First Lieutenant, 40th Mass. Infantry, Dec. 1, 1864.
Mustered out, June 16, 1865.
Howard, Henry W.
Second Lieutenant, 61st Mass. Infantry, Sept. 22, 1864. First Lieutenant, Jan. 20, 1865. Brevet Captain, U. S. Volunteers, Apr. 9, 1865.
Mustered out, June 4, 1865.
Howard, Ocran Harry.
Midshipman, U. S. Navy, Sept. 21, 1857, to Jan. 10, 1861. Second Lieutenant, 2d Mass. Infantry, May 25, 1861. First Lieutenant, Sept. 17, 1861.
Captain, Aug. 10, 1862, to Sept. 11, 1863. Captain, U. S. Signal Corps, Mar. 3, 1863.
See U. S. Army.
Howard, Thomas F.
Captain, 5th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 19, 1862.
Mustered out, July 2, 1863.
Howard, Willard.
Private, 44th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 12, 1862. Second Lieutenant, 54th Mass. Infantry, May 13, 1863; must
vet Lieut. Colonel and Colonel, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Mustered out, Nov. 28, 1865.
Hosmer, John Edward.
Born in Massachusetts.
Cadet, U. S. Military Academy, July 1, 1861. Second Lieutenant and First Lieutenant, 16th U. S. Infantry, June 23, 1865. Regimental Adjutant, Dec. 27, 1865, to Aug. 8, 1868.
Unassigned, Apr. 17, 1869.
Assigned to 13th U. S. Infantry, Jan. 7, 1870.
Died, July 13, 1870.
Howard, Ocran Harry.
Born in Massachusetts.
Midshipman, U. S. Navy, Sept. 21, 1857, to Jan. 10, 1861. Second Lieutenant, 2d Mass. Infantry, May 25, 1861. First Lieutenant, Sept. 17, 1861.
Captain, Aug. 10, 1862, to Sept. 11, 1863. Captain, U. S. Signal Corps, Mar. 3, 1863. Brevet Major and Lieut. Colonel, U. S. Volunteers, Apr. 9, 1865.
Mustered out, June 20, 1866. Second Lieutenant, 5th U. S. Artillery, Sept. 3, 1867. First Lieutenant, Sept. 1, 1871. Brevet First Lieutenant, Captain and Major, U. S. Army, Sept. 3, 1867.
Dropped, Mar. 11, 1876.
Howe, Frank E.