pr. 9, 1865.
Mustered out, Aug. 16, 1865.
Clark, John S.
Second Lieutenant, 1st Mass. Infantry, July 1, 1862. First Lieutenant, Mar. 1, 1863.
Captain, Sept. 22, 1863.
Mustered out, May 25, 1864.
Clark, Joseph H.
Second Lieutenant, 1st Mass. Heavy Artillery, Feb. 10, 1862. First Lieutenant, Feb. 25, 1863.
Captain, Jout, June 29, 1865.
Drury, William Patrick.
Corporal and Sergeant, 1st Mass. Infantry, May 23, 1861. Second Lieutenant, Sept. 8, 1862. First Lieutenant, Sept. 22, 1863.
Mustered out, May 25, 1864.
Captain, 61st Mass. Infantry, Sept. 22, 1864.
Discharged, Apr. 28, 1865.
Duchesney, Lawrence Nelson.
Private, 6th Infant action at Gettysburg, Va., July 1, 1863.
Thomas, Frank.
Second Lieutenant, 1st Mass. Infantry, May 13, 1862. First Lieutenant, Aug. 30, 1862.
Captain, Sept. 22, 1863; not mustered.
Mustered out. May 25, 1864, as First Lieutenant.
Thomas, Joseph M.
Second Lieutenant, 42d Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., J
in Brackett's Battalion, Minn. Cavalry, Jan. 1, 1864. First Sergeant, Second Lieutenant, Jan. 30, 1864; mustered, Sept. 9, 1864.
Discharged, June 1, 1866.
Cook, Henry Clay.
Born at Fall River, Mass. Second Lieutenant, 2d R. I. Infantry, June 5, 1861. First Lieutenant, 16th U. S. Infantry, Aug. 5, 1861; accepted, Aug. 7, 1861.
See U. S. Army.
Cook, Jacob B.
Residence at Charlestown, Mass., at time of enlistment.
First Lieutenant, 1st R. I. Cavalry, Feb. 14, 1863.
Resigned, Sept. 22, 1863.
Cooley, James Calvin.
Born in Massachusetts. First Sergeant, 133d N. Y. Infantry, Aug. 15, 1862. Second Lieutenant, Sept. 24, 1862. First Lieutenant, Jan. 26, 1863.
Captain, July 24, 1864.
Resigned, Feb. 27, 1865.
Private, 5th U. S. Cavalry, Mar. 24 to May 3, 1865. Second Lieutenant, May 3, 1865.
See U. S. Army.
Cooper, Samuel F.
Born in Massachusetts. Fourth Sergeant, 4th Iowa Cavalry, Sept. 18, 1861; mustered, Nov. 23, 1861. First Lieutenant, Adjutant, Dec. 26, 1861.
l Quartermaster, 4th La. National Guards, Feb. 17, 1863.
Regiment changed to 76th U. S. Colored Infantry, Apr. 4, 1864.
Resigned, July 27, 1864.
Hawkes, John M.
Appointed from Massachusetts. First Lieutenant, Assistant Surgeon, 33d U. S. Colored Infantry, Oct. 20, 1862.
Major, Surgeon, 21st U. S. Colored Infantry, Oct. 29, 1863.
Resigned, Nov. 21, 1865.
Hayden, Jesse G.
Private, 31st Mass. Infantry, Nov. 21, 1861.
Discharged as Sergeant, for promotion in Corps d'afrique, Sept. 22, 1863. Second Lieutenant, 91st U. S. Colored Infantry, Sept. 23, 1863.
Mustered out, Aug. 15, 1864.
Hepworth, George H.
Chaplain, 47th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Nov. 7, 1862.
Resigned, Feb. 11, 1863. First Lieutenant, 76th U. S. Colored Infantry.
Resigned, July 17, 1863.
Herrick, Thomas W.
Sergeant, 48th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Nov. 15, 1862.
Discharged for promotion, July 23, 1863. First Sergeant, General Banks' troops, Department of the