.
Mustered out, June 15, 1865.
Chapman, Andrew.
Second Lieutenant, 5th Mass. Cavalry, Dec. 22, 1863. First Lieutenant, Jan. 18, 1864.
Captain, May 30, 1865; not mustered.
Mustered out, Oct. nt, 19th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 28, 1861.
Re-enlisted as First Sergeant, 19th Mass. Infantry, Dec. 22, 1863. First Lieutenant, Sept. 18, 1864.
Discharged, May 26, 1865.
Osborn, Samuel.
Sergeante of the U. S., Sept. 20, 1862.
Captain, 2d Mass. Heavy Artillery, Aug. 14, 1863; mustered, Dec. 22, 1863.
Mustered out, Sept. 3, 1865.
Paine, Sumner.
Second Lieutenant, 20th Mass. Infantry, Artillery, Dec. 12, 1861.
Re-enlisted as First Sergeant, 7th Battery Mass. Light Artillery, Dec. 22, 1863. Second Lieutenant, Jan. 10, 1864.
Mustered out, Nov. 10, 1865.
Robinson, Charles T.
st Battery Mass. Light Artillery, Aug. 28, 1861. First Lieutenant, 2d Mass. Heavy Artillery, Dec. 22, 1863.
Captain, 14th Battery Mass. Light Artillery, Mar. 9, 1864.
Mustered out, June 15, 1865.
866. First Lieutenant, Feb. 25, 1867.
Resigned, Aug. 12, 1867.
Carruth, Sumner.
See General Officers.
Carruth, William Ward.
Born at Boston, Mass., Apr. 8, 1840. First Lieutenant and Regimental Quartermaster, 4th Infantry, M. V. M., in the service of the U. S., Apr. 22, 1861.
Mustered out, July 22, 1861. First Lieutenant, 6th Battery, Mass. Light Artillery, Dec. 5, 1861.
Captain, Sept. 7, 1862.
Captain, Assistant Adj. General, U. S. Volunteers, Sept. 4, 1863.
Resigned, Dec. 22, 1863.
Carter, John Wilkins.
Born in Massachusetts.
Private, Corporal and Q. M. Sergeant, 17th U. S. Infantry, Nov. 5, 1862, to Aug. 10, 1863. Second Lieutenant, Aug. 10, 1863. First Lieutenant, Sept. 25, 1863.
Resigned, Dec. 9, 1864.
Carter, Robert Goldthwaite.
Born in Maine.
Private, 22d Mass. Infantry, Aug. 5, 1862, to Oct. 4, 1864.
Cadet, U. S. Military Academy, July 1, 1865. Second Lieutenant, 4th U. S. Cavalry, June 15, 1870. First Lieutenant, Feb. 21, 1875.
Retired, Jun
icers.
Caraher, Andrew Patrick.
Born in Ireland.
Captain, 28th Mass. Infantry, Oct. 8, 1861.
Major, July 26, 1862.
Mustered out, Sept. 20, 1863.
Major, 4th Veteran Reserve Corps, Sept. 21, 1863. Lieut. Colonel, Sept. 29, 1863.
Colonel, 2d U. S. Volunteer Infantry, Feb. 18, 1865. First Lieutenant, 43d U. S. Infantry, July 28, 1866.
See U. S. Army.
Carleton, William F.
Private, 3d Mass. Cavalry, Nov. 1, 1861. Second Lieutenant, 1st La. Cavalry, Aug. 26, 1862.
Discharged, Dec. 22, 1863.
Carpenter, Edward E.
Residence at Attleborough, Mass., at time of enlistment.
First Sergeant, 3d R. I. Heavy Artillery, Oct. 5, 1861.
Re-enlisted in 3d R. I. Heavy Artillery, Jan. 20, 1864. Second Lieutenant, Mar. 28, 1865. First Lieutenant, May 13, 1865.
Mustered out, June 9, 1865.
Carpenter, George.
Residence at Seekonk, Mass., at time of enlistment.
First Lieutenant, 3d R. I. Heavy Artillery, Oct. 9, 1861.
Died of disease at Fort Seward, Bay Point, S. C., June 28, 18
. 12, 1864.
Mustered out, Jan. 31, 1866.
Learned, Samuel F. H.
Private, 1st Mass. Infantry, May 23, 1861.
Promoted in U. S. Colored Troops, Mar. 27, 1863. Second Lieutenant, 81st U. S. Colored Infantry.
Resigned, Mar. 8, 1865.
Leavitt, Herbert D.
Residence at Boston, Mass., at time of enlistment.
Private, 5th R. I. Heavy Artillery, Dec. 16, 1861.
Sergeant, Dec. 27, 1862. Second Lieutenant, 14th R. I. Colored Heavy Artillery, afterwards 11th U. S. Colored Heavy Artillery, Dec. 22, 1863.
Mustered out, Oct. 2, 1865.
Leonard, Andrew Watson.
Private, 13th Mass. Infantry, July 16, 1861. Second Lieutenant, 54th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 18, 1863; mustered, Nov. 19. First Lieutenant, Jan. 31, 1864; mustered, Mar. 5.
Captain, 103d U. S. Colored Infantry, May 9, 1865.
Mustered out, Apr. 16, 1866.
Died at Independence, Iowa, Jan. 4, 1880.
Lincoln, Benjamin C.
Corporal, 39th Mass. Infantry, Sept. 2, 1862.
Captain, 2d U. S. Colored Infantry, July 26, 1863.
Major, July