ck.Mass.Mass.Mass.July 7, 1863.Actg.
3d Asst. Engr.Iron Age.North Atlantic.Feb. 10, 1864.Appointment revoked.Actg.
3d Asst. Engr.
Sept. 15, 1864.Actg.
3d Asst. E
Ship.---
Sept. 15, 1864.Asst. Surgeon.
Dearborne, John G.,N. H.Mass.Mass.Feb. 10, 1864.Actg. Asst. Surgeon.Cornubia.West Gulf.Jan. 22, 1866.Hon. discharged.Actg. ss.Mass.May 13, 1863.Actg. Ensign.Guard; Shamrock.West Gulf; North Atlantic.Feb. 10, 1864.Appointment revoked.Actg. Ensign.
May 16, 1864.Actg. Ensign.June 8, 1865.D,Mass.Mass.Mass.Sept. 5, 1862.Actg. Asst. Surgeon.Montgomery.North Atlantic.Feb. 10, 1864.Resigned.Actg. Asst. Surgeon.
Lincoln, Edward T.,
Credit, Somerville.Ma 1863.Dismissed.Actg. Asst. Surgeon.
Racao, Frederick W.,Curacoa.Mass.Mass.Feb. 10, 1864.Actg.
3d Asst. Engr.Harvest Moon.North Atlantic.Aug. 23, 1865.Hon. dischar Hudson.East Gulf.Oct. 11, 1864.Resigned.Mate.
White, William,Me.Mass.Mass.Feb. 10, 1864.Actg. Master's Mate.Chenango.South Atlantic.Aug. 1,‘65.Hon. discharged.Actg
Lieut. Colonel, May 6, 1864.
Mustered out, July 8, 1864.
Cook, John Hawkins.
Private, 10th Mass. Infantry, June 21, 1861.
Discharged (disability), July 17, 1862. Second Lieutenant, 57th Mass. Infantry, Nov. 27, 1863. First Lieutenant, Feb. 10, 1864.
Discharged (disability resulting from wound received in action), Dec. 27, 1864. Brevet Captain and Brevet Major, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Cooke, John S.
First Lieutenant, 26th Mass. Infantry, Sept. 25, 1861.
Captain, Sept. 19 V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 12, 1862; mustered, Sept. 23, 1862.
Captain, Feb. 2, 1863; mustered, Mar. 2, 1863.
Mustered out, Sept. 1, 1863. Second Lieutenant, 58th Mass. Infantry, Nov. 14, 1863; mustered, Nov. 18, 1863.
Captain, Feb. 10, 1864; mustered, Feb. 20.
Major, Aug. 8, 1864; mustered, Aug. 25. Lieut. Colonel, Aug. 31, 1864; not mustered.
Mustered out, July 24, 1865, as Major.
Hovey, Charles H.
First Lieutenant, 13th Mass. Infantry, July 16, 1861.
Captain, Nov. 6,
Lieutenant, 3d Mass. Heavy Artillery, Nov. 24, 1853. First Lieutenant, 5th Mass. Cavalry, Jan. 20, 1864. First Lieutenant, 14th Battery, Mass. Light Artillery, Feb. 10, 1864.
Resigned, Jan. 14, 1865.
Bradley, Adoniram J.
Second Lieutenant, 15th Mass. Infantry, May 21, 1862. First Lieutenant, Sept. 19, 1862.
Captain, Jan. 22, 1861. First Lieutenant, Jan. 18, 1862.
Captain, Aug. 3, 1863.
Mustered out, Oct. 7, 1864.
Follansbee, Joseph.
Second Lieutenant, 37th Mass. Infantry, Feb. 10, 1864.
Died, May 23, 1864, of wounds received in action.
Follett, Dexter H.
Captain, 3d Battery Mass. Light Artillery, Sept. 5, 1861.
Resigned, Nov. 27, 1861ug. 2, 1861. First Lieutenant, 26th Mass. Infantry, Sept. 24, 1861.
Resigned, Apr. 10, 1862.
Johnson, Charles H.
Second Lieutenant, 58th Mass. Infantry, Feb. 10, 1864. First Lieutenant, Mar. 8, 1864.
Captain, Aug. 8, 1864.
Died of wounds, Oct. 27, 1864, at Petersburg, Va.
Johnson, Charles R.
Captain, 16th Mass. Infan
Infantry, Feb. 14, 1865.
Mustered out, July 16, 1865.
Ordway, John P.
Major, Surgeon, 1st Battery Light Artillery, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., May 18, 1861.
Mustered out, Aug. 2, 1861.
Osborne, George Sterne.
Acting Assistant Surgeon, July 8, 1862, to Sept. 9, 1862. First Lieutenant, Assistant Surgeon, 1st Mass. Cavalry, Mar. 17, 1863; mustered, Apr. 1, 1863.
Discharged to accept promotion, Jan. 23, 1864.
Major, Surgeon, 5th Mass. Cavalry, Dec. 30, 1863; mustered, Feb. 10, 1864.
Resigned, May 7, 1864.
Major, Surgeon in charge of hospital transport George Leary, from May 16, 1864, to June 8, 1864. Acting Assistant Surgeon, Aug. 19, 1864, to Sept. 28, 1865.
Otis, George Alexander.
Major, Surgeon, 27th Mass. Infantry, Sept. 14, 1861.
Resigned, June 26, 1864. First Lieutenant, Assistant Surgeon, U. S. Volunteers, June 30, 1864.
See United States Army.
Page, Calvin G.
First Lieutenant, Assistant Surgeon, U. S. Volunteers, Aug. 8, 1862.
Major, Surg
Sergeant, 3d R. I. Heavy Artillery, Oct. 5, 1861. Second Lieutenant, Feb. 3, 1864.
Mustered out, Mar. 17, 1865.
Smith, Eugene B.
Residence in Massachusetts at time of enlistment.
Private, 40th N. Y. Infantry, Feb. 9, 1864; mustered, Feb. 10, 1864. Second Lieutenant, commissioned, Mar. 30, 1865, to rank, Dec. 24, 1864.
Mustered out June 27, 1865.
Smith, Horatio M.
Born in Massachusetts.
Private, 105th Ohio Infantry, Aug. 13, 1862. Quartermaster Sergeant, Aug. 28, 1862. Second Lolunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Mustered out, Aug. 9, 1865.
Stratton, Franklin Asa.
See General Officers.
Stuart, Addison A.
Born in Massachusetts. First Lieutenant, 17th Iowa Infantry, Mar. 26, 1862.
Captain, Dec. 1, 1862.
Resigned, Feb. 10, 1864.
Stuart, Hiram F.
Sergeant, 3d Mass. Cavalry, Sept. 27, 1861. First Lieutenant, 1st La. Cavalry, Aug. 26, 1862.
Resigned, Sept. 5, 1863.
Sullivan, William O., Jr.
Credited to Massachusetts.
Captain, 40th N. Y. Infantry, June 27,