Second Lieutenant, 3d Mass Cavalry, Dec. 4, 1862.
Resigned, Jan. 15, 1864.
Conn, Charles K.
Second Lieutenant, 39th Mass. Infantry, July 20, 1864. First Lieutenant, Dec. 20, 1864.
Mustered out, June 2, 1865.
Conner, Henry Clay.
Second Lieutenant, 22d Mass. Infantry, Oct. 1, 1861. First Lieutenant, Feb. 17, 1862.
Captain, Aug. 12, 1862.
Resigned, Nov. 14, 1863.
Conner, Henry Clay.
Captain, 4th Mass. Heavy Artillery, Aug. 12, 1864.
Mustered out, June 17, 1865.
Conner, James.
First Lieutenant, 42d Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., July 22, 1864.
Mustered out, Nov. 11, 1864.
Conners, John.
First Lieutenant, 28th Mass. Infantry, May 19, 1864.
Captain, Aug. 16, 1864.
Mustered out, June 30, 1865.
Converse, Charles S.
First Lieutenant, 5th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 16, 1862.
Mustered out, July 2, 1863.
Captain, 5th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., July 27, 1864.
Mustered out, Nov. 16, 1864.
C
261
Comins, L. B., 210, 261, 514
Comsett, M. W., 261
Comstock, A. H., 32
Comstock, C. B., 173, 408, 515, 640
Conant, C. H., 261
Conant, C. O., 261
Conant, G. H., 462
Conant, G. W. T., 487
Conant, J. H., 261
Conant, Marcus, Jr., 261
Conant, Sherman, 210, 487
Conant, Thomas, 261
Condon, J. P., 261
Condrin, J. T., 32
Coney, C. J., 32
Coney, J. S., 261
Conklin, C. G., 32
Conklin, G. H., 261
Conlin, Lawrence, 261
Conn, C. K., 261
Conner, H. C., 261
Conner, H. C., 261
Conner, James, 261
Conners, John, 261
Connor, G. W., 32
Connor, H. P., 34
Connor, John, 34
Converse, C. S., 261
Converse, G. S., 462
Converse, J. B., 581
Converse, J. W., 261
Conwell, R. H., 261
Coogan, Owen, 581
Cook, A. M., 210
Cook, A. W., 261
Cook, Andrew, 261
Cook, Arthur, 571
Cook, B. B., 84
Cook, B. F., 34
Cook, B. F., 210, 606, 641
Cook, Berna, 34
Cook, D. P., 34
Cook, F. A., 34
Cook, F. A., 261
Cook, F. C., 261
Cook, F. H., 261
Cook, George, 574
Cook, H. C., 408, 462,