erely wounded at the battle of Opequon.
Lieut. Colonel, Apr. 30, 1865. Brevet Colonel and Brig. General, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Mustered out, July 26, 1865.
Hawkes, George Perkins.
Born in Massachusetts.
Captain 21st Mass. Infantry, July 19, 1861.
Major, June 2, 1862. Lieut. Colonel, Dec. 18, 1862.
Engaged in the siege of Knoxville.
In command of regiment after Apr., 1863.
Honorably discharged, July 3, 1864. Brevet Brig. General, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Hayes, Joseph.
Born at South Berwick, Me., Sept. 14, 1835.
Major, 18th Mass. Infantry, July 26, 1861.
At Washington, D C., attached to 1st Brigade, Porter's Division; present at the siege of Yorktown, Va.; in charge of regiment in the Peninsular campaign. Lieut. Colonel, Aug. 25, 1862; engaged in the battles of Antietam, Md., and Shepherdstown, Va. Colonel, Nov. 30, 1862; engaged in the battles of Fredericksburg, Chancellorsville, Upperville, Gettysburg, Pa.; in charge of 1st Brigade, 1st Divisi
ug. 1, 1861. Lieut. Colonel, Oct. 25, 1862.
Mustered out, June 27, 1864.
Hart, Samuel cook.
First Sergeant, 3d Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Apr. 23, 1861.
Mustered out, July 22, 1861. First Lieutenant, 23d Mass. Infantry, Sept. 28, 1861.
Promoted Captain, June 25, 1862. Lieut. Colonel, 4th Mass. Heavy Artillery, Nov. 14, 1864.
Mustered out, June 17, 1865.
Hartwell, Alfred Stedman.
See General Officers.
Hawkes, George Perkins.
See General Officers.
Hayes, Joseph.
See General Officers.
Henry, George Edmund.
Second Lieutenant, 1st Mass. Infantry, May 25, 1861.
Promoted First Lieutenant, July 13, 1861.
Captain, July 12, 1862.
Mustered out, May 25, 1864. First Lieutenant, Adjutant, 14th Veteran Reserve Corps, June 18, 1864. Brevet Major, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865. Brevet Captain, U. S. Volunteers, Nov. 2, 1865.
Discharged, Sept. 26, 1867.
Henry, Guy Vernor.
See General Officers.
Higginson, Henry Lee.
Second Lieutenant
r, U. S. Volunteers, Oct. 31, 1861.
Died, Dec. 24. 1863.
Hayden, Ferdinand Vandivere.
Born in Massachusetts.
Major, Surgeon, U. S. Volunteers, Feb. 19, 1863. Brevet Lieut. Colonel, U. S. Volunteers, June 1, 1865.
Resigned, June 22, 1865.
Hayden, Horace John.
Born in Massachusetts. Second Lieutenant, 3d U. S. Artillery, Aug., 1861. First Lieutenant, Aug. 5, 1861. Brevet Captain, U. S. Army, June 27, 1862. Brevet Major, U. S. Army, Mar. 13, 1865.
Resigned, Oct. 31, 1868.
Hayes, Joseph.
See General Officers.
Hayward, Joseph W.
Born in Massachusetts. First Lieutenant, Assistant Surgeon, U. S. Volunteers, July 5, 1864. Brevet Major, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Mustered out, Nov. 22, 1865.
Head, George Edward.
Born in Massachusetts. First Lieutenant, 11th U. S. Infantry, May 14, 1861; accepted, July 10, 1861. Regimental Adjutant, from Oct. 1, 1862, to Apr. 24, 1863.
Captain, July 12, 1864. Brevet Major, U. S. Army, Aug. 1, 1864.
Transferred to 29th
421, 469, 530
Hawkes, J. M., 490
Hawkes, Timothy, 292
Hawkins, R. C., 658
Hawkins, Samuel, 70
Hawley, C. P., 292
Hawley, J. M., 162
Hawley, W. A., 421
Hawthorne, Nathaniel, 658
Hay, E. S., 292
Hayden, D. H., 70
Hayden, E. D., 70
Hayden, F. B., 292
Hayden, F. V., 421, 530
Hayden, F. W., 292, 469
Hayden, H. J., 421, 531
Hayden, J. G., 490
Hayden, J. L., 292
Hayden, L. M., 292
Hayden, W. H., 292
Hayes, C. H., 292
Hayes, E. W., 292
Hayes, Frank, 292
Hayes, Frank, 469
Hayes, Joseph, 182, 215, 421, 531
Hayes, Martin, 292
Hayes, Peter, 70
Hayes, W. L., 70
Hayner, Herrick, 469
Haynes, D. J., 292
Haynes, E. E., 292
Haynes, Stillman, 576
Hayward, A. E., 292
Hayward, A. M., 292
Hayward, C. H., 293
Hayward, E. T., 293
Hayward, H. J., 293
Hayward, J. McL., 382
Hayward, J. W., 421, 531
Hayward, L. E., 293
Hayward, Nathan, 382, 531
Hayward, W. E., 293
Hazard, A. R., 70
Hazel, Edwin, 293
Hazelton, I. H., 70
Hazewell, C. C., 658
Head, C. D., 582
Head, G.