, 1857.
Edward T. Whitney, 1856-1858.
John B. Atwill, 1857-1860.
James G. Hovey, 1857.
John Remick,
Elected May 1, 1857, in place of James G. Hovey, deceased. 1857, 1858.
Knowlton S. Chaffee, 1858, 1859.
Chester W. Kingsley, 1858.
Thomas G. Rice, 1858.
James P. Richardson, 1858-1860.
Solomon Sargent, 1858.
Albion K. P. Welch, 1858, 1859.
Josiah Burrage, 1859, 1860.
Francis L. Chapman, 1859, 1860,
1864-1866.
Alex. Dickinson, 1859, 1860.
David Ellis, 1859, 1860.
Michaeney, 1855.
William W. Bullock, 1856.
Chester N. Clark, 1856-1858.
Curtis Davis, 1856-1858.
Hervey Davis, 1856, 1857.
John H. Fellows, 1856-1858.
N. St. John Green, 1856.
Michael C. Kenney, 1856-1858.
William Page, 1856, 1857.
Thomas G. Rice, 1856, 1857.
Ezra Ripley, 1856.
Samuel Sawyer, 1856, 1857.
Atherton H. Stevens, Jr., 1856, 1867.
Albion K. P. Welch, 1856, 1857.
James C. Davis, 1857, 1858, 1872,
Elected March 24, 1872, in place of J. Milton Clark, resigned. 1873
794.
Deac. Aaron Hill, 1777, 1778, 1787, 1788.
Jonas Wyeth, 1777, 1778.
Benjamin Locke, 1777, 1778.
Edward Jackson, 1777, 1778, 1780– 1782.
Thomas Farrington, 1778, 1779.
Benjamin Cooper, 1778.
William Howe, 1779.
Gideon Frost, 1779-1785.
William Adams, 1779.
Ammi Cutter, 1779, 1786.
John Gardner, 1779.
Moses Robbins, 1779, 1781-1786, 1790-1792.
John Wyeth, 1780.
Jeduthun Wellington, 1780-1785, 1792 -1802, 1805.
Samuel Whittemore 3d, 1780.
Ebenezer Seaver, 1780.
Ebenezer Wyeth, 1781-1785, 1789, 1790.
John Adams, 1781, 1782, 1791-1795.
Ephraim Frost, Jr., 1783-1788.
Daniel Dana, 1783.
Jonathan Winship, 1784-1789, 1793, 1794.
William Winthrop, 1786, 1789-1791, 1793, 1794, 1799, 1800-1802.
Walter Dickson, 1786-1788, 1791, 1792.
Samuel Butterfield, 1787, 1788.
Ephraim Cook, 1789, 1790.
Samuel Locke, 1789, 1790.
James Robbins, 1789.
Moses Griggs, 1790-1792.
Richard Richardson, 1791-1795.
George Prent
, 1824, 1825.
Isaiah Bangs, 1824-1826.
Jabez Fisher, 1825, 1826, 1840.
William Brown, 1826-1828.
William Fiske, 1827.
Ephraim Buttrick, 1827-1831, 1842, 1843.
Josiah Mason, Jr., 1828-1831.
Atherton H. Stevens, 1828-1831.
Edmund T. Hastings, 1828-1830.
Eliab W. Metcalf, 1829-1833.
James Hayward, 1831, 1832.
Ralph Smith, 1832-1835, 1837.
Luther Brooks, 1832-1835, 1837.
Robert Fuller, 1832-1834.
Wm. J. Whipple, 1833-1835.
John Chamberlin, 1834, 1835.
Joseph Burridge, 1835, 1836.
William Parmenter, 1836.
Charles C. Little, 1836-1841.
Jesse Hall, 1836.
William Hunnewell, 1836, 1837.
Nathan Childs, 1837, 1838.
Walter R. Mason, 1838, 1839.
John L. Hobbs, 1838, 1839.
Walter M. Allen, 1840, 1841.
Jonathan Wheeler, 1840.
Sidney Willard, 1841, 1844.
William H. Odiorne, 1841.
Levi Parker, 1841.
Thomas Whittemore, 1842, 1843.
James Luke, 1842, 1843.
Sylvanus Plympton, 1842.
William Saunders, 1842.
Jacob H. Bates, 1843
865, 1866.
Ezra Parmenter, 1867.
Charles H. Saunders, 1868, 1869.
Hamlin R. Harding, 1870, 1871.
Henry O. Houghton, 1872.
Isaac Bradford, 1873-1876.
Frank A. Allen, 1877.
Aldermen.
Samuel Batchelder, 1846.
Ephraim Buttrick, 1846, 1848.
Samuel P. P. Fay, 1846.
William Fisk, 1846.
Joseph S. Hastings, 1846, , 1869.
Joseph H. Converse, 1870, 1871.
Alvaro Blodgett, 1872, 1873.
Resigned June 17, 1873.
Francis H. Whitman, 1873.
George F. Piper, 1874, 1875.
Frank A. Allen, 1876.
Perez G. Porter, 1877.
Members of Common Council.
Josiah Coolidge, 1846, 1847.
John C. Dodge, 1846-1848, 1854.
Francis Draper, 1846, 1847.
es Mellen Jr., 1874, 1875.
John T. G. Nichols, 1874, 1875.
Charles Quinn, 1874, 1875.
Edmund Reardon, 1874, 1875.
Sulvilyer H. Sanborn, 1874, 1875.
Frank A. Allen, 1875, 1876.
William E. Doyle, 1875, 1876.
Henry D. Forbes, 1875, 1876.
David Heffernan, 1875.
Lemuel Kempton, 1875.
Charles Moore, 1875, 1876.
Je
1872, 1877.
Joshua G. Gooch, 1871, 1872.
James E. Hall, 1871, 1872.
Levi Hawkes, 1871, 1872.
Wm. L. Lockhart, 1871.
Charles R. Patch, 1871, 1872.
Warren G. Roby, 1871.
Elected July 1, 1871, in place of Ezra Parmenter, resigned.
Alonzo R. Smith, 1871.
John H. Swiney,
Elected May 15, 1871, in place of Wm. L. Lockhart, resigned. 1871, 1872.
Francis H. Whitman, 1871-1873.
James A. Woolson, 1871.
Sumner J. Brooks, 1872.
George B. Hamlin, 1872.
Joseph G. Holt, 1872.
Thomas L. Huckins, 1872.
Harrison W. Huguley, 1872.
Francis Ivers, 1872, 1873.
John L. Porter, 1872.
Thomas L. Smith, 1872.
John Stone, 1872, 1873, 1875.
Joseph A. Wellington, 1872.
John Clary, 1873-1876.
Frank Corcoran, 1873, 1874.
G. C. W. Fuller, 1873.
Thomas Grieves, 1873.
Leander M. Hannum, 1873.
George H. Howard, 1873, 1874.
John F. Hudson, 1873.
Samuel L. Montage, 1873, 1874.
Edward H. Norton, 1873, 1874.
George F. Piper, 1873-1875.
Charles C. Read, 1873, 1874.
Richar
56.
Joseph Lee, 1764, 1765.
Thomas Gardner, 1769-1774.
John Winthrop, 1774.
Abraham Watson, Jr., 1775, 1776.
Samuel Thatcher, 1775, 1776, 1779, 1782, 1784-1786.
William Bowman, 1776.
Eliphalet Robbins, 1776.
Stephen Sewall, 1777.
Stephen Dana, 17 78, 178 7, 1788, 1792, 1793.
Thomas Farrington, 1780.
Jeduthun Wellington, 1788, 1793, 1794. 1800-1802, 1804-1806.
Aaron Hill [Deac.], 1789, 1790.
Ebenezer Bradish, 1791.
Aaron Hill [Dr.], 1795-1800.
Joseph Bartlett, 1801.
Jonathan L. Austin, 1803, 1806.
Mr. Autin was Secretary of State, 1806-1807, and State Treasurer, 1811.
Daniel Mason, 1804-1806.
William Whittemore, 1804-1806.
Nathaniel P. Watson, 1807.
Samuel Butterfield, 1807.
Josiah Mason, 1807.
Samuel P. P. Fay, 1808-1812, 1815– 1818, 1820.
John Mellen, 1808-1812.
William Hilliard, 1811-1817, 1821, 1822, 1827, 1834.
Royal Makepeace, 1813, 1814, 1818, 1827-1830.
James P. Chaplin, 1819.
Richard H. Dana, 1819.
1862.
Isaac C. Holmes, 1861, 1862, 1872.
William F. Knowles, 1861, 1862.
J. Warren Merrill, 1861.
John S. Pollard, 1861, 1862.
Nathaniel D. Sawin, 1861, 1862.
George P. Carter, 1862, 1863.
K. S. Chaffee, 1862, 1863, 1867, 1871, 1872, 1876. Hosea Clark, 1862.
P. Stearns Davis, 1862.
Samuel W. Dudley, 1862.
Edward B. P. Kinsley, 1862.
James P. Richardson, 1862.
Joseph H. Tyler, 1862, 1873.
John Wilder, 1862.
Sumner Albee, 1863-1865.
Nathaniel P. Brooks, 1863-1866.
Francis C. Foster, 1863, 1864.
James M. Price, 1863, 1864.
Henry C. Rand, 1863, 1864.
George E. Richardson, 1863, 1864.
Amos C. Sanborn, 1863-1865.
Fordyce M. Stimson, 1863.
James M. Thresher, 1863.
William Brine, 1864, 1865.
William Daily, 1864-1866.
Samuel H. Folsom, 1864.
William Hutchins, 1864.
John S. March, 1864-1866.
John S. Sawyer, 1864, 1865.
Charles B. Stevens, 1864, 1865.
James H. Wyeth, 1864, 1865.
Walter S. Blanchard, 1865.
Robert O. Fuller, 1865, 1866.
Nathan G. G
on, 1855.
David S. Buck, 1855.
George Fisher, 1855.
Asa F. Lawrence, 1856.
William Parker, 1856.
Eben Manson, 1856.
Henry S. Hills, 1856, 1857.
William A. Saunders, 1857, 1858.
Wm. T. Richardson, 1857, 1859.
John C. Dodge, 1857.
Josiah Burrage, Jr., 1857.
Nathan K. Noble, 1858-1860.
William Page, 1858.
Alanso Livermore, 1853, 1854.
George Meacham, 1853.
John Taylor, 1853.
Henry M. Chamberlain, 1854, 1859.
Henry S. Hills, 1854.
Linus A. Phillips, 1854.
William A. Saunders, 1854, 1867.
John B. Cook, 1855, 1856.
Isaac Cutler, 1855-1857.
John Dudley, 1855.
James W. Gates, 1855.
Joseph R. Knight, 1855.
George H. Davie51.
Henry S. Hills,
Elected Oct. 6, 1851, in place of Robert P. Tuten, deceased. 1850, 1851.
George Meacham, 1850-1852.
Luther L. Parker, 1850, 1851.
Wm. A. Saunders, 1850.
Edmund Boynton, 1851, 1852.
Hiram Brooks, 1851.
Mason Davis, 1851, 1863, 1864.
Royal Douglass, 1851.
George T. Gale,
Elected Dec. 15, 1851,
. Stevens, Jr., 1856, 1867.
Albion K. P. Welch, 1856, 1857.
James C. Davis, 1857, 1858, 1872,
Elected March 24, 1872, in place of J. Milton Clark, resigned. 1873.
James C. Fiske, 1857-1859.
George B. Lathrop, 1857, 1858, 1862– 1864.
John Murray, Jr., 1857.
Michael Norton, 1857.
Samuel S. Runey, 1857.
Samuel Saunders, 1857.
J. Henry Wyman, 1857.
Marshall T. Bigelow, 1858-1860, 1867.
Wm. P. Butterfield, 1858, 1859.
Francis L. Chapman, 1858.
David Ellis, 1858.
Charles F. McClure, 1858, 1859.
Thomas B. G. Messinger, 1858, 1859.
Joseph Newmarch, 1858, 1863.
Lucius R. Paige, 1858.
Ezra Parmenter, 1858,
Elected May 24, 1858, in place of John H. Fellows, resigned. 1871.
Jared Shepard, 1858, 1859, 1861, 1862.
Albert Stevens, 1858-1860.
Sargeant C. Whitcher, 1858.
Ebenezer Fogg, 1859, 1861-1863.
Hamlin R. Harding, 1859-1861.
Anson P. Hooker, 1859-1861.
Samuel James, 1859.
Henry Lamson, 1859, 1860.
John Livermore, 1859, 1860.
Edward Mi
rge B. Lathrop, 1865, 1866.
Alpheus Mead, 1865, 1866, 1869.
James M. Price, 1865.
John L. Sands, 1865, 1866.
Sumner Albee, 1866.
John N. Meriam, 1866, 1867.
Asa P. Morse, 1866.
John M. Tyler, 1866, 1867.
William Gibson, 1867.
Watson B. Hastings, 1867, 1868.
William Page, 1867, 1868.
Samuel B. Rindge, 1867, 1868.
Samuel F. Woodbridge, 1867, 1868, 1872, 1873.
William Wright, 1867, 1869, 1876.
Marshall T. Bigelow, 1868.
Daniel U. Chamberlin, 1868, 1870.
U. Tracy Howe, 18689, 1860.
Israel Tibbetts, 1859, 1860, 1867.
Joseph V. Wellington, 1859, 1860.
Henry Whitney, Jr., 1859, 1861.
George L. Cade, 1860, 1864.
Henry M. Chamberlain, 1860, 1861.
Eben M. Dunbar, 1860, 1862.
John C. Farnham, 1860, 1861.
Watson B. Hastings, 1860, 1869.
James Jelly, 1860, 1861, 1863.
John H. Leighton, 1860.
James Mellen, 1860, 1861, 1868.
Nathan K. Noble, 1860, 1866.
Josiah Porter, 1860, 1861.
Jonas C. Wellington, 1860, 1861.
John S. Bates, 1861, 1862.
Russell S.