3d Asst. Engr.
Brackett, Frank E.,
Credit, Charlestown.Mass.Mass.Mass.Dec. 19, 1861.Actg. Master's Mate.Virginia.West Gulf.Nov. 3, 1865.Hon. discharged.Actg. Ensign.
Juno 24, 1864.Actg. Ensign.
Bradbury, Edward E.,
Transferred to regular service.Mass.Mass.Mass.Aug. 25, 1864.Actg. Master's Mate.Rhode Island; Miantono.West India.---
Bradbury, George H.,-Mass.Mass.June 5, 1861.Actg. Master.--Feb. 28, 1862.Resigned.Actg. Master.
Bradford, Lawrence,
Credit, Waltham.Mass.Mass.Mass.May 2, 1862.Actg. Master's Mate.Savannah; Shokokon; Victoria.North Atlantic.July 12, 1865.Hon. discharged.Mate.
Bradford, Robert F.,
In service prior to 1861.
See Navy Register.Mass.Mass.Mass.—--,‘61.Lieutenant.Chocorua.North Atlantic.---
Aug. 6, 1862.Lieut.-Comdr.
Bradley, Leander D.,Mass.Mass.Mass.Sept. 25, 1863.Actg.
Asst. Paymr.Katahdin.West Gulf.Sept. 20, 1865.Discharged.Actg.
Asst. Paymr.
Brady Edward,
See enlistment, Aug. 6, 1861.
Credit, Lynn. B. C.Mass.Mass.Apr. 5, 1863.Actg. B
, 3d U. S. Colored Infantry, Nov. 11, 1863, to date Aug. 29, 1863.
Major, Sept. 13, 1865.
Mustered out, Oct. 31, 1865.
Cook, Asa Merrill.
Major, 1st Battery, Light Artillery, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Apr. 20, 1861; mustered, May 18, 1861.
Mustered out, Aug. 2, 1861.
Captain, 8th Battery, Light Artillery, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., June 10, 1862.
Mustered out, Nov. 29, 1862.
Cook, Benjamin F.
First Lieutenant, 12th Mass. Infantry, June 26, 1861.
Captain, May 2, 1862.
Major, July 23, 1863. Lieut. Colonel, May 6, 1864.
Mustered out, July 8, 1864.
Cook, John Hawkins.
Private, 10th Mass. Infantry, June 21, 1861.
Discharged (disability), July 17, 1862. Second Lieutenant, 57th Mass. Infantry, Nov. 27, 1863. First Lieutenant, Feb. 10, 1864.
Discharged (disability resulting from wound received in action), Dec. 27, 1864. Brevet Captain and Brevet Major, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Cooke, John S.
First Lieutenant, 26th Mass. Infantry, Sept
4.
Pray, Ruel B.
Second Lieutenant, 17th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 21, 1861. First Lieutenant, Dec. 19, 1861.
Resigned, Aug. 9, 1862.
Pray, William.
Sergeant, 29th Mass. Infantry, May 22, 1861. First Lieutenant, Jan. 4, 1862.
Captain, May 2, 1862.
Discharged (disability), Jan. 9, 1863. Second Lieutenant, 18th Corps d'afrique (afterward 89th U. S. Colored Infantry), Jan. 9, 1864.
See U. S. Colored Troops.
Pray, William W.
Second Lieutenant, 29th Mass. Infantry, May 22, 1862. Fir
Second Lieutenant, 48th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 19, 1862. First Lieutenant, Dec. 12, 1862.
Resigned, June 20, 1863.
Saunders, Gilman.
Second Lieutenant, 12th Mass. Infantry, June 21, 1861. First Lieutenant, May 2, 1862.
Mustered out, Sept. 10, 1862.
Saunders, John.
Captain, 1st Co. Mass. Sharpshooters, Sept. 2, 1861.
Killed in action at Antietam, Sept. 17, 1862.
Saunders, Robert A.
Second Lieutenant, 1st Mass. Infantry, May 25, 1861.
Resigned,
cis E. R.
Chaplain, 31st Mass. Infantry, June 12, 1862.
Mustered out, Nov. 26, 1864.
Clark, Edward L.
Chaplain, 12th Mass. Infantry, June 26, 1861.
Resigned, June 16, 1862.
Clark, Edward W.
Chaplain, 47th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Mar. 25, 1863.
Mustered out, Sept. 1, 1863.
Clarke, Jonas B.
Chaplain, 23d Mass. Infantry, Sept. 18, 1861.
Resigned, Aug. 19, 1863.
Cleaveland, John P.
Chaplain, 30th Mass. Infantry, Feb. 20, 1862.
Mustered out, May 2, 1862.
Coe, Isaac H.
Chaplain, 4th Mass. Heavy Artillery, Apr. 3, 1865.
Mustered out, June 17, 1865.
Colby, William P.
Chaplain, 17th Mass. Infantry, Sept. 2, 1863.
Resigned, Nov. 2, 1863.
Cromack, Joseph C.
Chaplain, 19th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 26, 1861.
Transferred to 22d Mass. Infantry, Nov. 8, 1861.
Resigned, Mar. 19, 1862.
Cudworth, Warren Handel.
Chaplain, 1st Mass. Infantry, May 22, 1861.
Mustered out, May 28, 1864.
Cummings, Gilbert.
Chaplain, 51st Infan
Tex., July 19, 1865.
Poor, Charles E.
Sergeant, 6th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Apr. 22, 1861.
Mustered out, Aug. 2, 1861. First Lieutenant, 6th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Aug. 31, 1862.
Mustered out, June 3, 1863. First Lieutenant, 38th U. S. Colored Infantry.
Resigned, Oct. 5, 1865.
Pratt, Benjamin Franklin.
See General Officers.
Pray, William.
Sergeant, 29th Mass. Infantry, May 22, 1861. First Lieutenant, Jan. 4, 1862.
Captain, May 2, 1862.
Discharged (disability), Jan. 9, 1863. Second Lieutenant, 18th Corps d'afrique, afterwards 89th U. S. Colored Infantry, Jan. 9, 1864.
Mustered out, Aug. 12, 1864.
Preston, Daniel J.
First Lieutenant, 35th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 12, 1862.
Captain, Sept. 28, 1862.
Major, 36th U. S. Colored Infantry, Dec. 6, 1863.
Resigned, Aug. 29, 1864.
Proctor, George B.
Corporal, 25th Mass. Infantry, Sept. 12, 1861. First Lieutenant, 2d N C. Colored Volunteers, afterward 36th U. S. Colore
, April 1, 1862, .p. 2, col. 3.
—Ad. Farragut's demands for surrender of. Marion A. Baker.
Century, vol. 22, p. 459.
—Ad. Farragut in. Gideon Welles.
Galaxy, vol. 12, pp. 669, 816.
—Surrender, April 25, 1862. Boston Evening Journal, May 2, 1862, p. 2, col. 1; p. 4, col. 6.
— – Accounts from Southern papers, private letters, etc. Boston Evening Journal, May 12, 1862, p. 2, cols. 3, 4.
— – In Current events.
Harper's Mon., vol. 25, p. 258.
—Taking possession of. In Incidents ncan Wells, with letter of thanks from Gov. Andrew. Boston Evening Journal, May 6, 1862, p. 4, col. 2.
— – – From N. Y. Herald. Boston Evening Journal, April 30, 1862, p. 4, col. 3.
— – Late incidents and events.
Boston Evening Journal, May 2, 1862, p. 2, col. 2, p. 4, col. 2; May 3, p. 2, col. 3.
— – Greater activity, and news of evacuation.
Boston Evening Journal, May 3, 1862, p. 4, cols. 1, 3; May 5, p. 2, cols. 5, 7, p. 4, cols. 1-7; May 12, p. 1, cols. 1-3