f Malvern Hill, July 1, 1862; in command of Washington, D. C., during the rebel invasion of eastern Virginia, Aug. 19–Sept. 13, 1862. Chief Engineer of the defences of Washington, D. C., Sept. 13, 1862, to May 25, 1864. Lieut. Colonel, Corps of EnginSept. 13, 1862, to May 25, 1864. Lieut. Colonel, Corps of Engineers, March 3, 1863.
Military Member of a Scientific Commission for the investigation of subjects pertaining to the Navy department, June 22, 1863, to June 6, 1864; reconnoitring and devising the defences of Pittsburg, Penn., June, 1863; examining s Golding's Farm, June 28, 1862; Glendale, June 30, 1862; Malvern Hill, July 1, 1862. Brig. General, U. S. Volunteers, Sept. 13, 1862.
Resigned, Apr. 25, 1863.
Prescott, George Lincoln.
Born at Littleton, Mass., May 21, 1829.
Captain, 5th Infae of absence, June to Sept., 1862.
In command of expedition to Ponchatoula, the headquarters of General Jeff. Thompson, Sept. 13-23, 1862, destroying a large train and inflicting much other damage on the enemy.
Sick at New York City, Brig. General,
.
Sprague, Augustus Brown Reed.
See General Officers.
Stanwood, Eben Poore.
Captain, 48th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 2, 1862; mustered, Sept. 24, 1862.
Promoted Lieut. Colonel, July 2, 1863; mustered, July 20, 1863.
Mustered out, Sept. 3, 1863.
Stedman, Joseph.
Sergeant, 6th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Apr. 22, 1861.
Mustered out, Aug. 2, 1861.
Captain, 42d Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Aug. 29, 1862; mustered, Sept. 13, 1862. Lieut. Colonel, Nov. 11, 1862.
Mustered out, Aug. 20, 1863. Lieut. Colonel, 42d Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., July 22, 1864.
Mustered out, Nov. 11, 1864.
Steele, William R.
Second Lieutenant, 15th Mass. Infantry, May 11, 1862. First Lieutenant, Oct. 28, 1862.
Mustered out, July 28, 1864. Brevet Captain and Major, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Stephenson, Luther, Jr.
See General Officers.
Stevens, Atherton H., Jr.
Major, 1st Mass. Cavalry, July 19,
t mustered.
Resigned as First Lieutenant, Sept. 13, 1862.
Bacheller, Jeremiah C.
Second Lieutfantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 13, 1862.
Mustered out, July 21, 1863.
Baldwin,ry, M. V. M., in the service of the U. S., Sept. 13, 1862.
Mustered out, Aug. 20, 1863.
Burrell,ry, M. V. M., in the service of the U. S., Sept. 13, 1862.
Mustered out, Aug. 26, 1863.
Burrell,fantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 13, 1862; mustered, Sept. 19, 1862.
Captain, Nov. fantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 13, 1862.
Mustered out, Aug. 20, 1863.
Coburn, ry, M. V. M., in the service of the U. S., Sept. 13, 1862.
Captain, Nov. 12, 1862.
Mustered out, Afantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 13, 1862. First Lieutenant, 54th Mass. Infantry, MaInfantry, July 31, 1861. First Lieutenant, Sept. 13, 1862.
Captain, Mar. 19, 1864.
Mustered out, Mfantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Sept. 13, 1862. First Lieutenant, Mar. 24, 1863.
Mustere[2 more...]