ssistant Quartermaster and Commissary of post.
At Fort Ridgley, Minn.
Joined light battery of regiment at Camp Floyd, Utah, to May, 1861. Regimental Quartermaster, Feb. 20, 1861, to Aug. 24, 1861.
Joined regiment at Fort McHenry, Baltimore, Md., July, 1861.
Captain and Assistant Quartermaster, U. S. Army, Aug. 3, 1861; accepted, Aug. 26, 1861.
In charge of transportation, Washington, D. C., to Feb., 1863. Lieut. Colonel, U. S. Volunteers, and Chief Quartermaster, assigned, Jan. 1 to July 17, 1863, 1st Corps, Army of the Potomac, and engaged in the Chancellorsville and Gettysburg campaigns.
In charge of transportation, Washington, D. C., to Aug., 1864.
Colonel, Quartermaster, U. S. Volunteers, and in charge of 6th Division, Q. M. General's Office; assigned, Aug. 2, 1864, to Jan. 1, 1867, Washington, D. C. Brevet Major, Lieut. Colonel, Colonel and Brig. General, U. S. Army, Mar. 13, 1865.
Major and Quartermaster, U. S. Army, Jan. 18, 1867; accepted, Mar. 18, 1867.
In charge of
Lieutenant, 36th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 22, 1862. First Lieutenant, Regimental Quartermaster, July 17, 1863.
Resigned, Jan. 2, 1864.
Cutter, Thomas E.
First Lieutenant, Regimental Quartermasttered out, Aug. 30, 1864.
Goodspeed, Samuel A.
Second Lieutenant, 36th Mass. Infantry, July 17, 1863. First Lieutenant, Jan. 3, 1864.
Resigned, Apr. 22, 1864.
Goodwin, Francis E.
First Lenant, 1st Mass. Heavy Artillery, Feb. 17, 1862. First Lieutenant, 2d Mass. Heavy Artillery, July 17, 1863.
Captain, May 25, 1864.
Discharged (disability), Aug. 4, 1865.
Horne, Charles E.
SerPetersburg, Va.
Johnson, Charles R.
Captain, 16th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 1, 1861.
Died, July 17, 1863, of wounds received at Gettysburg.
Johnson, Daniel Hobbs, Jr.
Sergeant Major, 23d Mass Battery, Mass. Light Artillery, Aug. 5, 1862. Second Lieutenant, Sept. 28, 1862.
Resigned, July 17, 1863.
Manning, T.
Henry. First Sergeant, 4th Battery, Mass. Light Artillery, Sept. 6, 1861.
owley, Freeman S.
Born in Massachusetts. First Lieutenant, 30th U. S. Colored Infantry, May 4, 1864.
Mustered out, Dec. 10, 1865.
Bradbury, George.
Corporal, 17th Mass. Infantry, July 21, 1861.
Captain, 36th U. S. Colored Infantry, July 17, 1863.
Discharged, July 12, 1864.
Bridgeman, Eliot.
Captain, 31st Mass. Infantry, Feb. 20, 1862.
Colonel, 20th Corps d'afrique (afterwards 91st U. S. Colored Infantry), Oct. 15, 1863.
Discharged, July 7, 1864.
Bridgewater, George N.
ed Infantry, Sept. 23, 1863.
Mustered out, Aug. 15, 1864.
Hepworth, George H.
Chaplain, 47th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Nov. 7, 1862.
Resigned, Feb. 11, 1863. First Lieutenant, 76th U. S. Colored Infantry.
Resigned, July 17, 1863.
Herrick, Thomas W.
Sergeant, 48th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Nov. 15, 1862.
Discharged for promotion, July 23, 1863. First Sergeant, General Banks' troops, Department of the Gulf. Second Lieutenant, 78th U. S. Colore
6-8, p. 3, cols. 1, 2, p. 4, cols. 1, 3; Aug. 28, p. 4, cols. 1-8.
Boston riot,
July 14, 1863.
Compared with that of New York.
Boston Evening Journal, July 17, 1863, p. 4, col. 1.
— Cooper Street Armory. Boston Evening Journal, July 15, 1863, p. 2, col. 4, p. 4, cols. 1, 5, 6; July 16, p. 2, col. 4, p. 4, col. 3.
— Eg Journal; July 15, 1863, p. 2, col. 4, p. 4, cols. 1, 5, 6; July 16, p. 2, col. 4, p. 4, col. 3.
— Compared with that of New York.
Boston Evening Journal, July 17, 1863, p. 4, col. 1.
— Inquest upon the body of Wm. Currier. Boston Evening Journal, July 21, 1863, p. 2, col. 6; July 22, p. 2, col. 4; July 24, p. 4, cols. 7, 8urnal, July 15, 1863, p. 2, col. 4, p. 4, cols. 1, 5, 6; July 16, p. 2, col. 4, p. 4, col. 3.
— – – Compared with that of New York.
Boston Evening Journal, July 17, 1863, p. 4, col. 1.
— – – Inquest upon the body of Win. Currier.
Boston Evening Journal, July 21, 1863, p. 2, col. 6; July 22, p. 2, col. 4; July 2