tle of Cedar Mountain, Aug. 9, 1862.
In command of the department of the Gulf, Dec. 16, 1862; engaged in the siege of Port Hudson, May, 1863, to July 9, 1863.
Engaged in the Red River expedition; present at the battles of Sabine Cross Roads, Apr. 8, 1864, Pleasant Hill, Apr. 9, 1864, and Cane River, Apr. 23, 1864.
Received, Jan. 28, 1864, the thanks of Congress for the skill, courage and endurance which compelled the surrender of Port Hudson and thus removed the last obstruction to the free n Port Hudson, May 27 to July 8, 1863, and was one of the commissioners for receiving its surrender.
Chief of staff of Maj. General Banks, July 25, 1863, to Apr. 16, 1864; in skirmishes on Bayou Teche, Oct., 1863; battle of Sabine Cross Roads, Apr. 8, 1864, and battle of Pleasant Hill, Apr. 9, 1864.
Mustered out of volunteer service, Apr. 4, 1864.
Awaiting orders at Cairo, Ill., Apr. 18 to Aug. 13, 1864.
In command of brigade of 5th Corps, Army of the Potomac, before Petersburg, Aug. 21 to Se
h Mass. Infantry, May 1, 1865; mustered, July 1. First Lieutenant, July 11, 1865; mustered, July 27.
Mustered out, Aug. 20, 1865.
Died at Cambridge, Mass., June 16, 1868.
Conant, Marcus, Jr.
Second Lieutenant, 3d Mass. Heavy Artillery, Apr. 8, 1864. First Lieutenant, May 4, 1865.
Mustered out, Sept. 18, 1865.
Conant, Thomas.
Second Lieutenant, 29th Mass. Infantry, Dec. 6, 1862.
Mustered out, May 21, 1864.
Condon, John P.
First Lieutenant, 19th Mass. Infantry, June 30, 1864.nt, 27th Mass. Infantry, May 29, 1863. First Lieutenant, Mar. 1, 1864.
Captain, May 17, 1864.
Major, May 15, 1865; not mustered.
Mustered out, June 26, 1865, as Captain.
McKay, William S.
Sergeant and Sergeant Major, 3d Mass. Cavalry, Apr. 8, 1864. Second Lieutenant, July 21, 1865.
Mustered out, Sept. 28, 1865.
(S. O. No. 189, 1884.)
McKeever, Samuel.
First Lieutenant, 16th Mass. Infantry, July 2, 1861.
Resigned, Aug. 10, 1862.
Captain, 28th Mass. Infantry, Oct. 31, 1862.
Mus
, Apr. 30, 1866.
Transferred to 26th U. S. Infantry, Sept. 21, 1866.
Captain, 36th U. S. Infantry, July 28, 1866; accepted, Oct. 12, 1866.
Unassigned, May 19, 1869.
Assigned to 13th U. S. Infantry, July 5, 1870.
Vacated as Captain, Dec. 16, 1889.
Major and Assistant Adj. General, July 1, 1889; accepted, July 2, 1889.
MacKAYay, William S. (Porter, William MacKAYay).
Born in England.
Appointed in the Army.
Private, Corporal, Q. M. Sergeant and Sergeant Major, 3d Mass. Cavalry, Apr. 8, 1864, to July 20, 1865. Second Lieutenant, July 21, 1865; not mustered.
Mustered out as Sergeant Major, Sept. 28, 1865.
Private and Sergeant, 11th U. S. Infantry, Oct. 24, 1865, to Sept. 11, 1866. Second Lieutenant, Aug. 19, 1866.
Transferred to 29th Infantry, Sept. 21, 1866.
Unassigned, Apr. 25, 1869.
Assigned to 3d Infantry, Mar. 22, 1870. First Lieutenant, Nov. 1, 1872.
Resigned, Feb. 15, 1873.
Died Sept. 20, 1889.
MacOMBERmber, George.
Born in Massachusetts. First Lieutenant,