61.
Discharged (disability), May 15, 1861.
Muzzey, David P.
Second Lieutenant, 23d Mass. Infantry, Oct. 11, 1861.
Resigned, July 17, 1862. Second Lieutenant, 3d Mass. Cavalry, Sept. 16, 1862. First Lieutenant, Nov. 1, 1862.
Captain, June 17, 1863.
Major, Aug. 15, 1865.
Mustered out, Sept. 28, 1865.
Colonel, Oct. 5, 1865; never mustered.
Nettleton, Edward Payson.
Captain, 31st Mass. Infantry, Oct. 30, 1861; mustered, Dec. 10, 1861. Lieut. Colonel, Apr. 15, 1864; mustered, Aug. 5, 1864. Brevet Colonel, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Colonel, June 7, 1865; not mustered.
Mustered out, Sept. 9, 1865, as Lieut. Colonel.
Died at Boston, Apr. 17, 1889.
Nims, Ormand F.
Captain, 2d Battery, Mass. Light Artillery, July 31, 1861.
Resigned, Jan. 7, 1865. Brevet Major and Lieut. Colonel, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Norton, Hannibal D.
Third Lieutenant, 5th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., May 1, 1861.
Mustered out, July 31, 1861.
Captain, 32d
e of the U. S., May 3, 1864.
Mustered out, Aug. 5, 1864. Second Lieutenant, 27th Unattached CompanyCompany, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Aug. 5, 1864.
Mustered out, Nov. 12, 1864.
Captain, 17 of the U. S., May 14, 1864.
Mustered out, Aug. 5, 1864. First Lieutenant, 4th Mass. Heavy Artillere of the U. S., May 3, 1864.
Mustered out, Aug. 5, 1864.
Damon, Calvin A.
First Lieutenant, 6e of the U. S., May 4, 1864.
Mustered out, Aug. 5, 1864.
Private and Sergeant, 4th Mass. Heavy Artly 29, 1863.
Died at Fortress Monroe, Va., Aug. 5, 1864.
Pope, Henry Durfee.
Private and Firs of the U. S., May 11, 1864.
Mustered out, Aug. 5, 1864.
Captain, 4th Mass. Heavy Artillery, Aug. e of the U. S., May 3, 1864.
Mustered out, Aug. 5, 1864.
Tappan, Lewis William, Jr.
First Liehed Co., M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Aug. 5, 1864.
Mustered out, Nov. 12, 1864. Second Lieuthed Co., M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Aug. 5, 1864.
Mustered out, Nov. 12, 1864. First Lieute
d U. S. Artillery, Nov. 30, 1861. First Lieutenant, Nov. 30, 1861; accepted, Dec. 9, 1861. Brevet Captain, U. S. Army, July 3, 1863. Brevet Major, Aug. 25, 1864.
Captain, 3d U. S. Artillery, Dec. 20, 1875.
Retired, Dec. 10, 1889, disability in line of duty.
Barstow, Simon Forrester.
See General Officers.
Bartlett, William Francis.
See General Officers.
Barton, David.
Born in Massachusetts.
Captain, Assistant Quartermaster, U. S. Volunteers, Nov. 26, 1862.
Resigned, Aug. 5, 1864.
Batchelder, George A.
Born in Massachusetts. First Lieutenant, 22d Mass. Infantry, Oct. 1, 1861.
Captain, Sept. 26, 1862.
Mustered out, Oct. 17, 1864.
Major, Additional Paymaster, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 7, 1865.
Mustered out, Oct. 5, 1866.
Died, May, 1875.
Bates, Erastus Newton.
See General Officers.
Bates, James Lawrence.
See General Officers.
Bates, Joshua Hall.
Born in Massachusetts.
Cadet, U. S. Military Academy, July 1, 1833, to July 1, 1837. Second Lie