5.
Frankle, Jones.
See General Officers.
French, Jonas H.
Acting Lieut. Colonel, 30th Mass. Infantry, Nov. 11, 1861 (S. 0. 10, Adjutant General's orders, U. S. Army). Discharged, Mar. 27, 1862.
Not commissioned by the Governor of Massachusetts. Lieut. Colonel, Assistant Insp. General (staff of Maj. General Butler) and Provost Marshal General (La.), Mar.–Dec., 1862.
Fuller, Nehemiah P.
Captain, 17th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 21, 1861.
Captain, 2d Mass. Heavy Artillery, July 30, 18. Infantry, Nov. 20, 1861.
Resigned, Jan. 31, 1862.
Died at Washington, D. C., Apr., 1862.
Wheldon, Charles M.
Acting Lieut. Colonel, 31st Mass. Infantry, Nov. 25, 1861.
Discharged, Dec. 23, 1862.
Not commissioned by the Governor of Massachusetts.
White, Edward E.
First Lieutenant, Regimental Quartermaster, 39th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 25, 1862. Brevet Captain and Major, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Captain, Apr. 3, 1865; not mustered.
Mustered out, June 2, 1865, as First Lie
2, 1861. First Lieutenant, 3d Mass. Battery, Sept. 5, 1861.
Promoted Captain, Nov. 28, 1861.
Mustered out, Sept. 16, 1864. Brevet Major, Lieut. Colonel and Colonel, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Mason, Herbert Cowpland.
Second Lieutenant, 20th Mass. Infantry, Nov. 25, 1861.
Promoted First Lieutenant, July 8, 1862.
Captain, Jan. 6, 1863.
Discharged (disability resulting from wounds received in action), Mar. 23, 1864. Brevet Major, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Died at Stockbridge, Mass., Sept. 24, 1884.
Meacham, George A.
Lieut. Colonel, 16th Mass. Infantry, July 13, 1861.
Resigned, July 22, 1862.
Merriam, Waldo.
First Lieutenant, Adjutant, 16th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 1, 1861.
Major, Sept. 30, 1862. Lieut. Colonel, Nov. 28, 1862.
Killed at Spotsylvania, Va., May 12, 1864.
Merritt, Henry.
Major, 23d Mass. Infantry, Sept. 25, 1861. Lieut. Colonel, Oct. 24, 1861.
Killed at New Berne, N. C., Mar. 14, 1862.
Meserve, William N.
First Sergeant, 35th
c. 31, 1862.
Captain, Sept. 8, 1864. Brevet Major, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Mustered out, Sept. 18, 1865.
Bancroft, Ambrose.
First Lieutenant, 32d Mass. Infantry, July 30, 1862.
Captain, Dec. 29, 1862. Brevet Major, U. S. Volunteers, Apr. 9, 1865.
Mustered out, June 29, 1865.
Banks, Gardner.
Captain, 16th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 1, 1861.
Major, July 23, 1862. Lieut. Colonel, Sept. 30, 1862.
Colonel, Nov. 28, 1862.
Discharged for disability, Sept. 2, 1863.
Died at Waltham, Mass., July 9, 1871.
Barker, James H.
Major, 36th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 28, 1862.
Resigned, Jan. 29, 1863.
Barker, Thaddeus L.
Captain, 36th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 19, 1862.
Major, May 6, 1864. Lieut. Colonel, Oct. 12, 1864; mustered, Nov. 13, 1864.
Colonel, Nov. 13, 1864; not mustered.
Mustered out, June 8, 1865, as Lieut. Colonel.
Barnard, George Middleton, Jr.
First Lieutenant, 18th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 24, 1861.
Captain, Nov. 1, 1862.
Mustered out, Sept. 2, 1864. Breve
neral Officers.
Goodrich, Alonzo E.
Second Lieutenant, 8th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., June 15, 1861.
Mustered out, Aug. 1, 1861. Lieut. Colonel, 37th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 27, 1862.
Resigned, Jan. 16, 1863.
Died at Pittsfield, Mass., Feb. 25, 1881.
Goodwin, Frank.
First Lieutenant, 55th Mass. Infantry, June 7, 1863.
Captain, July 20, 1863. Brevet Major, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Mustered out, Aug. 29, 1865.
Gordon, George Henry.
See General Officer63.
Walton, James Morris.
First Lieutenant, 54th Mass. Infantry, Mar. 19, 1863; mustered, Mar. 28, 1863.
Captain, Oct. 7, 1863; mustered, Nov. 19, 1863.
Major, July 11, 1865; mustered, July 27.
Mustered out, Aug. 20, 1865.
Died at Pittsfield, Mass., May 25, 1874.
Ward, George Hull.
See General Officers.
Wardwell, David K.
Captain, 5th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., May 1, 1861.
Mustered out, July 31, 1861.
Captain, 22d Mass. Infantry, Oct. 1, 1861.
Major,
or, 28th Mass. Infantry, Oct. 8, 1861. Lieut. Colonel, July 26, 1862.
Commissioned Colonel, July 21, 1864; not mustered.
Mustered out, Dec. 13, 1864.
Cass, Thomas.
Colonel, 9th Mass. Infantry, June 11, 1861.
Died of wounds received at Malvern Hill, July 12, 1862.
Chamberlain, Samuel Emery.
See General Officers.
Chambers, John G.
First Lieutenant, Adjutant, 5th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., May 1, 1861.
Mustered out, July 31, 1861. First Lieutenant, 23d Mass. U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Messer, Carlos page.
Colonel, 50th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Nov. 11, 1862.
Mustered out, Aug. 24, 1863.
Miller, Ozro.
Major, 10th Mass. Infantry, June 15, 1862.
Killed at Malvern Hill, Va., July 1, 1862.
Mirick, Franklin B.
Second Lieutenant, 35th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 13, 1862. First Lieutenant, Jan. 1, 1863.
Captain, June 24, 1863.
Major, Nov. 14, 1864.
Mustered out, June 9, 1865.
Montague, George L.
Major, 37
1, 1861.
Commissioned Colonel, Nov. 8, 1864; not mustered.
Brevet Major, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Mustered out, July 29, 1865, as Captain.
Died at Roxbury, Mass., Feb. 17, 1895.
Codman, Charles Russell.
Captain and Adjutant, 1st Corps Cadets, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., May 27, 1862.
Mustered out, July 2, Nov. 10, 1884.
Park, Edward G.
First Lieutenant, 35th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 4, 1862.
Captain, Mar. 23, 1863.
Major, May 10, 1864.
Died of wounds at Roxbury, Mass., Aug. 14, 1864.
Parker, Dexter F.
Private, 3d Battalion Riflemen, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Apr. 22, 1861. Fourth Lieutenant, May 4, 1861.
Cap1863.
Promoted Captain, Nov. 16, 1863.
Major, Nov. 16, 1864. Brevet Lieut. Colonel, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Mustered out, Sept. 18, 1865.
Died at Roxbury, Mass., Oct. 7, 1878.
Richardson, James Prentiss.
Captain, 3d Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S , Apr. 19, 1861; mustered, Apr. 23, 1861.
Mustered ou
ot mustered.
Brevet Lieut. Colonel and Colonel, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Mustered out, Aug. 16, 1865, as Lieut. Colonel.
Shaw, Robert Gould.
Private, 7th N. Y. State Militia, Apr. 19, 1861. Second Lieutenant, 2d Mass. Infantry, May 28, 1861. First Lieutenant, July 8, 1861.
Captain, Aug. 10, 1862. Aide-de-Camp to General George H. Gordon.
Major, 54th Mass. Infantry, Mar. 31, 1863; mustered, Apr. 11.
Colonel, Apr. 17, 1863; mustered, May 13.
Killed in the assault upon Fort Wagner, S. C., July 18, 1863.
Sheen, William Gordon.
Private, 4th Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., May 22, 1861.
Mustered out, July 22, 1861. Second Lieutenant, 35th Mass. Infantry, July 31, 1862. First Lieutenant, 39th Mass. Infantry, Aug. 14, 1862.
Promoted Captain, Sept. 8, 1864. Brevet Major, U. S. Volunteers, Apr. 1, 1865.
Mustered out, June 2, 1865.
Shepard, Edward Olcott.
First Lieutenant, 32d Mass. Infantry, June 16, 1862.
Captain, Aug. 21, 1862; mustered, Oct. 21
Discharged (disability), July 26, 1864.
Moore, John W.
First Lieutenant, 27th Mass. Infantry, Oct. 16, 1861.
Captain, Jan. 2, 1862.
Major, June 4, 1864.
Discharged, Mar. 8, 1865.
Moore, McLelland.
Captain, 11th Mass. Infantry, June 13, 1861.
Resigned, Oct. 8, 1861. Lieut. Colonel, 28th Mass. Infantry, Nov. 25, 1861.
Resigned, July 25, 1862.
Morissey, John.
Major, 3d Infantry, M. V. M., in service of the U. S., Oct. 15, 1862.
Mustered out, June 26, 1863.
Died at Plymouth, Mass., Dec. 27, 1885.
Morse, Augustus.
Colonel, 21st Mass. Infantry, Aug. 21, 1861.
Resigned, May 15, 1862.
Captain, Assistant Quartermaster, U. S. Volunteers, July 14, 1862.
See United States Army.
Morse, Charles F.
First Lieutenant, 2d Mass. Infantry, May 28, 1861.
Captain, July 11, 1862.
Major, June 6, 1863. Lieut. Colonel, July 4, 1863. Brevet Colonel, U. S. Volunteers, Mar. 13, 1865.
Colonel, July 14, 1865; not mustered.
Mustered out, July 14, 1865, as Lieut. Colonel.