hide
Named Entity Searches
hide
Sorting
You can sort these results in two ways:
- By entity
- Chronological order for dates, alphabetical order for places and people.
- By position (current method)
- As the entities appear in the document.
You are currently sorting in ascending order. Sort in descending order.
hide
Most Frequent Entities
The entities that appear most frequently in this document are shown below.
Entity | Max. Freq | Min. Freq | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Sprague | 35 | 1 | Browse | Search |
Ebenezer Turell | 30 | 0 | Browse | Search |
Henry Putnam | 29 | 1 | Browse | Search |
Matthew Ellis | 28 | 0 | Browse | Search |
New England (United States) | 26 | 0 | Browse | Search |
Charlestowne (South Carolina, United States) | 22 | 0 | Browse | Search |
Mike Martin | 20 | 0 | Browse | Search |
Thomas Gleason | 18 | 0 | Browse | Search |
Katherine H. Stone | 18 | 0 | Browse | Search |
Paul Revere | 18 | 0 | Browse | Search |
View all entities in this document... |
Browsing named entities in a specific section of Medford Historical Society Papers, Volume 24.. Search the whole document.
Found 23 total hits in 23 results.
Hooper (search for this): chapter 31
In Memoriam.
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence January 31, 1856—November 2, 1921 life Member Vice-President since 1899
Leonard Jarvis Manning May 11, 1856—November 20, 1921 Vice President, 1907-16
Charles Nelson Jones . . .1836—December 3, 1921 Member in 1897.
Honorary in 1918
Agnes Wyman Lincoln July 13, 1856—December 27, 1921 Curator and Librarian, 1900-19 Vice-President, 1920-21
John Henry Hooper May 5, 1833—December 31, 1921 President, 1901-3 Historian of Medf
Leonard Jarvis Manning (search for this): chapter 31
In Memoriam.
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence January 31, 1856—November 2, 1921 life Member Vice-President since 1899
Leonard Jarvis Manning May 11, 1856—November 20, 1921 Vice President, 1907-16
Charles Nelson Jones . . .1836—December 3, 1921 Member in 1897.
Honorary in 1918
Agnes Wyman Lincoln July 13, 1856—December 27, 1921 Curator and Librarian, 1900-19 Vice-President, 1920-21
John Henry Hooper May 5, 1833—December 31, 1921 President, 1901-3 Historian of Medf
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence (search for this): chapter 31
In Memoriam.
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence January 31, 1856—November 2, 1921 life Member Vice-President since 1899
Leonard Jarvis Manning May 11, 1856—November 20, 1921 Vice President, 1907-16
Charles Nelson Jones . . .1836—December 3, 1921 Member in 1897.
Honorary in 1918
Agnes Wyman Lincoln July 13, 1856—December 27, 1921 Curator and Librarian, 1900-19 Vice-President, 1920-21
John Henry Hooper May 5, 1833—December 31, 1921 President, 1901-3 Historian of Medf
Agnes Wyman Lincoln (search for this): chapter 31
In Memoriam.
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence January 31, 1856—November 2, 1921 life Member Vice-President since 1899
Leonard Jarvis Manning May 11, 1856—November 20, 1921 Vice President, 1907-16
Charles Nelson Jones . . .1836—December 3, 1921 Member in 1897.
Honorary in 1918
Agnes Wyman Lincoln July 13, 1856—December 27, 1921 Curator and Librarian, 1900-19 Vice-President, 1920-21
John Henry Hooper May 5, 1833—December 31, 1921 President, 1901-3 Historian of Medf
Charles Nelson Jones (search for this): chapter 31
In Memoriam.
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence January 31, 1856—November 2, 1921 life Member Vice-President since 1899
Leonard Jarvis Manning May 11, 1856—November 20, 1921 Vice President, 1907-16
Charles Nelson Jones . . .1836—December 3, 1921 Member in 1897.
Honorary in 1918
Agnes Wyman Lincoln July 13, 1856—December 27, 1921 Curator and Librarian, 1900-19 Vice-President, 1920-21
John Henry Hooper May 5, 1833—December 31, 1921 President, 1901-3 Historian of Medf
1907 AD (search for this): chapter 31
In Memoriam.
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence January 31, 1856—November 2, 1921 life Member Vice-President since 1899
Leonard Jarvis Manning May 11, 1856—November 20, 1921 Vice President, 1907-16
Charles Nelson Jones . . .1836—December 3, 1921 Member in 1897.
Honorary in 1918
Agnes Wyman Lincoln July 13, 1856—December 27, 1921 Curator and Librarian, 1900-19 Vice-President, 1920-21
John Henry Hooper May 5, 1833—December 31, 1921 President, 1901-3 Historian of Medf
1836 AD (search for this): chapter 31
In Memoriam.
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence January 31, 1856—November 2, 1921 life Member Vice-President since 1899
Leonard Jarvis Manning May 11, 1856—November 20, 1921 Vice President, 1907-16
Charles Nelson Jones . . .1836—December 3, 1921 Member in 1897.
Honorary in 1918
Agnes Wyman Lincoln July 13, 1856—December 27, 1921 Curator and Librarian, 1900-19 Vice-President, 1920-21
John Henry Hooper May 5, 1833—December 31, 1921 President, 1901-3 Historian of Medf
1903 AD (search for this): chapter 31
In Memoriam.
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence January 31, 1856—November 2, 1921 life Member Vice-President since 1899
Leonard Jarvis Manning May 11, 1856—November 20, 1921 Vice President, 1907-16
Charles Nelson Jones . . .1836—December 3, 1921 Member in 1897.
Honorary in 1918
Agnes Wyman Lincoln July 13, 1856—December 27, 1921 Curator and Librarian, 1900-19 Vice-President, 1920-21
John Henry Hooper May 5, 1833—December 31, 1921 President, 1901-3 Historian of Medf
December 3rd, 1921 AD (search for this): chapter 31
In Memoriam.
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence January 31, 1856—November 2, 1921 life Member Vice-President since 1899
Leonard Jarvis Manning May 11, 1856—November 20, 1921 Vice President, 1907-16
Charles Nelson Jones . . .1836—December 3, 1921 Member in 1897.
Honorary in 1918
Agnes Wyman Lincoln July 13, 1856—December 27, 1921 Curator and Librarian, 1900-19 Vice-President, 1920-21
John Henry Hooper May 5, 1833—December 31, 1921 President, 1901-3 Historian of Medf
1905 AD (search for this): chapter 31
In Memoriam.
Rosewell Bigelow Lawrence January 31, 1856—November 2, 1921 life Member Vice-President since 1899
Leonard Jarvis Manning May 11, 1856—November 20, 1921 Vice President, 1907-16
Charles Nelson Jones . . .1836—December 3, 1921 Member in 1897.
Honorary in 1918
Agnes Wyman Lincoln July 13, 1856—December 27, 1921 Curator and Librarian, 1900-19 Vice-President, 1920-21
John Henry Hooper May 5, 1833—December 31, 1921 President, 1901-3 Historian of Medford, 19